Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Brachfeld, Erica L, against Boester, Barbara, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Kent M. Kellegrew presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 2005 |
CategoryCollections |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time3535 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152 | |
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 21 effective 02/06/2015. | |
February 08, 2006 | Docket Event | 02/08/2006: Request for Dismissal of Entire Action WITHOUT Prejudice filed | |
January 20, 2006 | Docket Event | 01/20/2006: Original Summons returned as to COMPLAINT of CAPITAL ONE BANK | |
January 20, 2006 | Docket Event | 01/20/2006: Proof of Service (Sub-service) of Summons and COMPLAINT of CAPITAL ONE BANK as to BARBARA BOESTER, by sub-serving JOHN DOE,MALE,45,5'9",CAUC,210#,BROWN HAIR. Mailing date of 12/23/05. | |
December 05, 2005 | Docket Event | 12/05/2005: Amount prayed: DAMAGES $1328.42; INTEREST @ 25.9% FROM 11/5/04; ATTY FEES | |
December 05, 2005 | Docket Event | 12/05/2005: Vertical Case Assignment 43 - Ventura | |
December 05, 2005 | Docket Event | 12/05/2005: Complaint (Limited - prayer amount $10,000.00 or less) filed Receipt Number: 512050261 for $146.0 Filed By: CAPITAL ONE BANK(Plaintiff) Refers To: BOESTER, BARBARA(Defendant) | |
December 05, 2005 | Docket Event | 12/05/2005: Declaration re: Court Assignment filed | |
December 05, 2005 | Docket Event | 12/05/2005: Case Information Sheet filed. Type of trial requested: COURT. Estimated time: NOT STATED. Mediation eligible NO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.