Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Newton, P, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Miner, Robert G., against Castalini Inc, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 02, 2005 |
CategoryCollections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions69 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time297 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 25, 2006 | Docket Event | 09/25/2006: Writ of EXECUTION (EXPIRED) from Orange County returned NOT satisfied | |
August 17, 2006 | Docket Event | 08/17/2006: APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF CHARLES L WALLACE ON BEHALF OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR CASTALINI INC Hearing: OFF-CALENDAR | |
June 08, 2006 | Docket Event | 06/08/2006: Uniform Civil Filing Fee Paid by P NEWTON (Application for order for judgment debtor exam (CCP 708.110, CCP 708.160 - no separate fee is charged for filing the abstract of judgment with the application) Receipt Number: 606080219 for $40.0 | |
June 08, 2006 | Docket Event | 06/08/2006: Application and Order for Appearance and Examination of CHARLES L WALLACE on behalf of Judgment Debtor CASTALINI INC (Small Claims) filed by P NEWTON | |
March 01, 2006 | Docket Event | 03/01/2006: Uniform Civil Filing Fee Paid by P NEWTON (Issuing writ of attachment, writ of mandate, writ of execution, writ of sale, writ of possession, writ of prohibition, writ of restitution or other enforcement) Receipt Number: 603010189 for $15.0 | |
March 01, 2006 | Docket Event | 03/01/2006: Writ of Execution for Money (Unlimited) Issued for Orange County in the amount of $31086.30 | |
February 09, 2006 | Docket Event | 02/09/2006: STATEMENT OF ACCOUNT filed by P NEWTON | |
February 09, 2006 | Docket Event | 02/09/2006: Judgment entered on COMPLAINT of NEWTON for P NEWTON | |
February 09, 2006 | Docket Event | 02/09/2006: Judgment After Default by Clerk entered on 02/09/06 as follows: | |
February 09, 2006 | Docket Event | 02/09/2006: ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT filed by P NEWTON |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.