Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Riverpark Legacy Llc, filed a(n) Misc Complaints - Other case represented by Goldsmith, Michele M. Esq, against Cfm Builders, Inc., represented by Myer, Raymond A, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 02, 2005 |
CategoryMisc Complaints - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time2799 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed pursuant to GC 68152(d) 1 or 2 | |
November 17, 2006 | Docket Event | 11/17/2006: COURT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CRC 225 Hearing: VACATED | |
November 13, 2006 | Docket Event | 11/13/2006: COURT TRIAL (LONG CAUSE). TIME ESTIMATE: 4 days 0:00 hours. Hearing: OFF-CALENDAR | |
October 25, 2006 | Docket Event | 10/25/2006: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE Hearing: OFF-CALENDAR | |
October 20, 2006 | Docket Event | 10/20/2006: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service filed by CFM BUILDERS, INC.. | |
October 16, 2006 | Docket Event | 10/16/2006: Request for Dismissal of Entire Action WITH Prejudice filed | |
September 15, 2006 | Docket Event | 09/15/2006: Notice of Settlement filed by RIVERPARK LEGACY LLC | |
September 15, 2006 | Docket Event | 09/15/2006: Unconditional Settlement filed as to entire case pursuant to CRC 225/525. | |
June 20, 2006 | Docket Event | 06/20/2006: Case Management Order - Unlimited Civil Case filed | |
May 12, 2006 | Docket Event | 05/12/2006: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (FILING OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT) Hearing: VACATED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.