Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Lawson, Amina, Fulton, Matthew, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Yorke, Brian, against Cuellar, Juan, Broyles, Richard Wayne, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 02, 2005 |
CategoryPi/Pd/Wd - Auto |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Cycle Time2799 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed pursuant to GC 68152(d) 1 or 2 | |
March 08, 2006 | Docket Event | 03/08/2006: COURT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON COMPLAINT of LAWSON AS TO UNSERVED DEFENDENT Hearing: VACATED | |
March 08, 2006 | Docket Event | 03/08/2006: Request for Dismissal of Entire Action WITH Prejudice filed | |
December 02, 2005 | Docket Event | 12/02/2005: Complaint (Unlimited) filed Receipt Number: 512020179 for $235.0 Filed By: FULTON, MATTHEW(Plaintiff) | LAWSON, AMINA(Plaintiff) Refers To: CUELLAR, JUAN(Defendant) | BROYLES, RICHARD(Defendant) | |
December 02, 2005 | Docket Event | 12/02/2005: Case Information Sheet filed: Type of trial requested: JURY. Estimated time of trial: 5 DAYS. Mediation eligible: NO | |
December 02, 2005 | Docket Event | 12/02/2005: Vertical Case Assignment 40 - Ventura | |
December 02, 2005 | Docket Event | 12/02/2005: Track Assignment: Standard | |
December 02, 2005 | Docket Event | 12/02/2005: Declaration re: Court Assignment filed | |
December 02, 2005 | Docket Event | 12/02/2005: Summons Issued; 30 day |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.