Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Sullins, Thomas, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Lovretovich, Joseph M., against Kinkle, Bruce, Holiday Retirementcorp, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 01, 2005 |
CategoryWrongful Termination |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Case Cycle Time2800 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed pursuant to GC 68152(d) 1 or 2 | |
February 03, 2006 | Docket Event | 02/03/2006: Request for Dismissal of Entire Action WITH Prejudice filed | |
January 25, 2006 | Docket Event | 01/25/2006: Proof of Service (PERSONAL) of Summons and COMPLAINT of SULLINS served on BRUCE KINKLE with service date of 01/11/06 | |
January 06, 2006 | Docket Event | 01/06/2006: Proof of Personal Service of Summons and COMPLAINT of SULLINS served on HOLIDAY RETIREMENT CORP by serving VIVIAN IMPERIAL, PERSON AUTH TO ACCEPT SERVICE with service date of 12/14/05 | |
January 06, 2006 | Docket Event | 01/06/2006: Original Summons returned as to COMPLAINT of SULLINS | |
December 01, 2005 | Docket Event | 12/01/2005: Complaint (Unlimited) filed Receipt Number: 512010322 for $235.0 Filed By: SULLINS, THOMAS(Plaintiff) Refers To: KINKLE, BRUCE(Defendant) | HOLIDAY RETIREMENTCORP(Defendant) | |
December 01, 2005 | Docket Event | 12/01/2005: Vertical Case Assignment 40 - Ventura | |
December 01, 2005 | Docket Event | 12/01/2005: Declaration re: Court Assignment filed | |
December 01, 2005 | Docket Event | 12/01/2005: Track Assignment: Standard | |
December 01, 2005 | Docket Event | 12/01/2005: Summons Issued; 30 day |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.