Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Morlas, Shannon Dale, Hall, Austin Mitchell, filed a(n) Petitions - Other case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 01, 2005 |
CategoryPetitions - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time57 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 27, 2006 | Docket Event | 01/27/2006: Proof of ATTEMPTED service by PERSONAL DELIVERY of ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE on KEVIN HALL with costs of $0.00 | |
January 27, 2006 | Docket Event | 01/27/2006: Certificate of Publication re: Name Change filed by SHANNON DALE MORLAS | |
January 27, 2006 | Docket Event | 01/27/2006: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CHANGE OF NAME Hearing: GRANTED | |
January 27, 2006 | Docket Event | 01/27/2006: Decree Changing Name filed | |
December 08, 2005 | Docket Event | 12/08/2005: Order to Show Cause re: Change of Name filed | |
December 01, 2005 | Docket Event | 12/01/2005: Petition for Change of Name filed Receipt Number: 512010261 for $235.0 Filed By: HALL, AUSTIN MITCHELL(Petitioner) | MORLAS, SHANNON DALE(Petitioner) | |
December 01, 2005 | Docket Event | 12/01/2005: Vertical Case Assignment 40 - Ventura |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.