Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
California Business Bureau Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Love, Franklin J., against Graham, Jason, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 01, 2005 |
CategoryCollections |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time3539 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152 | |
May 10, 2006 | Docket Event | 05/10/2006: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY REMOVAL AS TO JASON GRAHAM. Hearing: VACATED | |
May 05, 2006 | Docket Event | 05/05/2006: Reason: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED. | |
May 05, 2006 | Docket Event | 05/05/2006: Request for Dismissal of Entire Action WITH Prejudice filed | |
February 10, 2006 | Docket Event | 02/10/2006: Automatic Stay of Proceedings Before Trial as to Entire Case filed. Bankruptcy Case # 9:05-BK-14208-RR | |
February 10, 2006 | Docket Event | 02/10/2006: Notice of Filing of Bankruptcy as to COMPLAINT of CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC filed by JASON GRAHAM. Bankruptcy Case Number: 9:05-BK-14208KRR | |
January 06, 2006 | Docket Event | 01/06/2006: Proof of Service (PERSONAL) of Summons and COMPLAINT of CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC served on JASON GRAHAM with service date of 01/04/06 | |
December 01, 2005 | Docket Event | 12/01/2005: Vertical Case Assignment 40 - Ventura | |
December 01, 2005 | Docket Event | 12/01/2005: Track assignment: Economic | |
December 01, 2005 | Docket Event | 12/01/2005: Amount prayed: $2813.96 PLUS INTEREST; ATTORNEY FEES; COSTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.