Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
American Express Centurin Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Bleier, Elizabeth A., against Jacinto, Clarissa, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 01, 2005 |
CategoryCollections |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time3539 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152 | |
January 23, 2006 | Docket Event | 01/23/2006: Request for Dismissal of Entire Action WITHOUT Prejudice filed | |
December 01, 2005 | Docket Event | 12/01/2005: Track assignment: Economic | |
December 01, 2005 | Docket Event | 12/01/2005: Declaration re: Court Assignment filed | |
December 01, 2005 | Docket Event | 12/01/2005: Summons Issued; 30 day | |
December 01, 2005 | Docket Event | 12/01/2005: Case Information Sheet filed. Type of trial requested: COURT. Estimated time: 1 HR. Mediation eligible N | |
December 01, 2005 | Docket Event | 12/01/2005: Amount prayed: $2661.93; INTEREST; ATTORNEY FEES; COSTS; | |
December 01, 2005 | Docket Event | 12/01/2005: Vertical Case Assignment 42 - Ventura | |
December 01, 2005 | Docket Event | 12/01/2005: Complaint (Limited - prayer amount $10,000.00 or less) filed Receipt Number: 512010090 for $146.0 Filed By: AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURIN BANK(Plaintiff) Refers To: JACINTO, CLARISSA(Defendant) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.