Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Sment, Michael R, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Sment, Michael R., against Rowe, Robert, Global Qa Corporation, represented by Rosenmund, Frederick, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Tari L. Cody presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 28, 2005 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions353 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time3388 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 21 effective 02/06/2015. | |
September 04, 2007 | Docket Event | Case reopened. | |
September 04, 2007 | Docket Event | Disposition for ROWE, ROBERT on Complaint vacated. | |
September 04, 2007 | Docket Event | Old Republic National Title Insurance Company added as a Assignee effective 09/04/2007. | |
September 04, 2007 | Docket Event | Disposition for SMENT, MICHAEL on Complaint vacated. | |
September 04, 2007 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Court finding. | |
September 04, 2007 | Docket Event | Disposition for GLOBAL QA CORPORATION on Complaint vacated. | |
September 04, 2007 | Docket Event | Assignment of Judgment (Old Republic Title Company Assignee) filed by Old Republic National Title Insurance Company on 09/04/2007. | |
September 04, 2007 | Docket Event | Abstract issued. | |
February 02, 2007 | Docket Event | 02/02/2007: Abstract of Judgment issued and copy filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.