Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Estridge, Rachel Marie, filed a(n) Petitions - Other case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 31, 2005 |
CategoryPetitions - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time57 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 27, 2005 | Docket Event | 07/27/2005: Decree Changing Name filed | |
July 26, 2005 | Docket Event | 07/26/2005: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CHANGE OF NAME Hearing: GRANTED | |
July 18, 2005 | Docket Event | 07/18/2005: Certificate of Publication re: Name Change filed | |
June 01, 2005 | Docket Event | 06/01/2005: Order to Show Cause re: Change of Name filed | |
May 31, 2005 | Docket Event | 05/31/2005: Declaration re: Court Assignment filed | |
May 31, 2005 | Docket Event | 05/31/2005: Vertical Case Assignment 40 - Ventura | |
May 31, 2005 | Docket Event | 05/31/2005: Petition for Change of Name filed Receipt Number: 505310311 for $235.0 Filed By: ESTRIDGE, RACHEL MARIE(Petitioner) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.