Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Charter Adjustments Corporation, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Friedland, Steven, against Verroca, Steve V, Verroca, Steve, Verroca, Rita, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 31, 2005 |
CategoryCollections |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time3713 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 31, 2015 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152 | |
May 08, 2006 | Docket Event | 05/08/2006: COURT TRIAL (SHORT CAUSE). TIME ESTIMATE: 3:00 hours. Hearing: VACATED | |
May 04, 2006 | Docket Event | 05/04/2006: Request for Dismissal of Entire Action WITH Prejudice filed | |
December 28, 2005 | Docket Event | 12/28/2005: COURT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO FILE CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT - MANDATORY APPEARANCE FOR PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL ON COMPLAINT of CHARTER ADJUSTMENTS CORPORATION AS TO CHARTER ADJUSTMENTS CORPORATION Hearing: COMPLETED | |
December 01, 2005 | Docket Event | 12/01/2005: Case Management Statement filed by CHARTER ADJUSTMENTS CORPORATION | |
November 28, 2005 | Docket Event | 11/28/2005: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (FILING OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT) Hearing: VACATED | |
November 02, 2005 | Docket Event | 11/02/2005: Case Management Statement filed by STEVE V VERROCA, RITA VERROCA. Status Hearing set on 11/28/05 at 8:10 in courtroom 22B is vacated | |
September 21, 2005 | Docket Event | 09/21/2005: Substitution of Attorney filed. Former attorney WALTER F WIGGINS JR removed as to CHARTER ADJUSTMENTS CORPORATION and replaced with attorney STEVEN FRIEDLAND | |
July 12, 2005 | Docket Event | 07/12/2005: Answer (Limited Jurisdiction, Under $10,000) to COMPLAINT of CHARTER ADJUSTMENTS CORPORATION filed by RITA VERROCA, STEVE VERROCA, represented by PRO/PER Receipt Number: 507120371 for $284.0 | |
June 14, 2005 | Docket Event | 06/14/2005: Proof of Service (Sub-service) of Summons and COMPLAINT of CHARTER ADJUSTMENTS CORPORATION as to RITA VERROCA, by sub-serving STEVE VERROCA, PERSON IN CHARGE. Mailing date of 06/08/05. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.