Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Moore, Harvey M., against Maria, Andrea, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Kent M. Kellegrew presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKent M. Kellegrew Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMay 31, 2005 |
CategoryCollections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions90 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time4478 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152 | |
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 21 effective 02/06/2015. | |
October 07, 2005 | Docket Event | 10/07/2005: Abstract of Judgment (Limited) issued and copy filed Receipt Number: 510070361 for $7.0 | |
August 29, 2005 | Docket Event | 08/29/2005: Default judgment entered against ANDREA MARIA | |
August 29, 2005 | Docket Event | 08/29/2005: Order Accepting Copies in Lieu of Originals filed by DISCOVER BANK | |
August 29, 2005 | Docket Event | 08/29/2005: Principal is $3241.56 | |
August 29, 2005 | Docket Event | 08/29/2005: Judgment entered on COMPLAINT of DISCOVER BANK for DISCOVER BANK | |
August 29, 2005 | Docket Event | 08/29/2005: Total Judgment is $3946.43. | |
August 29, 2005 | Docket Event | 08/29/2005: Costs are $201.00 | |
August 29, 2005 | Docket Event | 08/29/2005: Attorney fees are $278.55 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.