Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
O'Brien, Edward, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Katz, Michael I., against Rodriguez, Barbara, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrederick H. Bysshe, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMay 31, 2005 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions14 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time4478 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152 | |
February 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Case reassigned to Department 22 effective 02/11/2017.
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
|
February 07, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 23 effective 02/06/2015. | |
February 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 48 effective 02/02/2014. | |
January 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 44 effective 01/20/2013. | |
June 27, 2005 | Docket Event | 06/27/2005: Writ of Possession ( REAL PROPERTY ) issued to Ventura County RETURNED and filed | |
June 14, 2005 | Docket Event | 06/14/2005: Judgment entered on COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) of O'BRIEN for EDWARD O'BRIEN | |
June 14, 2005 | Docket Event | 06/14/2005: Application and Declaration for Issuance of Writ of Possession filed. | |
June 14, 2005 | Docket Event | 06/14/2005: Judgment Ordered as follows: | |
June 14, 2005 | Docket Event | 06/14/2005: Request for Entry of Default and CLERK'S Judgment on COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) of O'BRIEN as to defendant/cross-defendant(s) ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS filed by EDWARD O'BRIEN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.