Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Interinsurance Exchange Of Theautomobile, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Corona, Salvador, against Perry, Christopher, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 31, 2005 |
CategoryInsurance Coverage |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Case Cycle Time3760 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 16, 2015 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152 | |
July 21, 2005 | Docket Event | 07/21/2005: Request for Dismissal of Entire Action WITHOUT Prejudice filed | |
May 31, 2005 | Docket Event | 05/31/2005: Complaint (Limited - prayer amount $10,000.00 or less) filed Receipt Number: 505310130 for $146.0 Filed By: INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THEAUTOMOBILE(Plaintiff) Refers To: PERRY, CHRISTOPHER(Defendant) | |
May 31, 2005 | Docket Event | 05/31/2005: Track assignment: Economic | |
May 31, 2005 | Docket Event | 05/31/2005: Declaration re: Court Assignment filed | |
May 31, 2005 | Docket Event | 05/31/2005: Summons Issued; 30 day | |
May 31, 2005 | Docket Event | 05/31/2005: Amount prayed: COMPENSATORY DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $3347.00 | |
May 31, 2005 | Docket Event | 05/31/2005: Vertical Case Assignment 40 - Ventura | |
May 31, 2005 | Docket Event | 05/31/2005: Case Information Sheet filed. Type of trial requested: COURT. Estimated time: NOT STATED. Mediation eligible NO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.