Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Winn, Brian N., against Thawley, John E, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Kent M. Kellegrew presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKent M. Kellegrew Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMay 31, 2005 |
CategoryCollections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions90 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time4478 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152 | |
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 21 effective 02/06/2015. | |
September 14, 2005 | Docket Event | 09/14/2005: Abstract of Judgment (Limited) issued and copy filed Receipt Number: 509140262 for $7.0 | |
August 29, 2005 | Docket Event | 08/29/2005: Judgment entered on COMPLAINT of CAPITAL ONE BANK for CAPITAL ONE BANK | |
August 29, 2005 | Docket Event | 08/29/2005: Total Judgment is $2584.93. | |
August 29, 2005 | Docket Event | 08/29/2005: Attorney fees are $0.00 | |
August 29, 2005 | Docket Event | 08/29/2005: Declaration RE UNDERLYING ACTION OF OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT filed by CAPITAL ONE BANK | |
August 29, 2005 | Docket Event | 08/29/2005: Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the COMPLAINT of CAPITAL ONE BANK WITHOUT prejudice filed. | |
August 29, 2005 | Docket Event | 08/29/2005: Declaration RE EXCESS OF INTEREST filed by CAPITAL ONE BANK | |
August 29, 2005 | Docket Event | 08/29/2005: Request for Entry of Default and CLERK'S Judgment on COMPLAINT of CAPITAL ONE BANK as to defendant/cross-defendant(s) JOHN E THAWLEY filed by CAPITAL ONE BANK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.