Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Di Guilio, Raymond J, Di Guilio, Jean K, filed a(n) Misc Complaints - Other case represented by Nomi, Brian, against Passno, Phillip E, Passno, Kathleen M, All Persons Unknown, represented by Mcadam, Leslie A. Esq, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 27, 2005 |
CategoryMisc Complaints - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time2988 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed pursuant to GC 68152(d) 1 or 2 | |
June 19, 2006 | Docket Event | 06/19/2006: COURT TRIAL (LONG CAUSE). TIME ESTIMATE: 5 days 0:00 hours. Hearing: OFF-CALENDAR | |
May 22, 2006 | Docket Event | 05/22/2006: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE Hearing: VACATED | |
May 08, 2006 | Docket Event | 05/08/2006: COURT TRIAL (LONG CAUSE). TIME ESTIMATE: 5 days 0:00 hours. Hearing: CONTINUED NOT HEARD | |
April 27, 2006 | Docket Event | 04/27/2006: Request for Dismissal of Entire Action WITHOUT Prejudice filed | |
April 24, 2006 | Docket Event | 04/24/2006: Statement of Agreement or Nonagreement filed - mediation ended in full agreement | |
April 13, 2006 | Docket Event | 04/13/2006: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE Hearing: CONTINUED NOT HEARD | |
April 12, 2006 | Docket Event | 04/12/2006: HEARING RE MEDIATION Hearing: COMPLETED | |
April 06, 2006 | Docket Event | 04/06/2006: Mandatory Settlement Conference Statement received from PHILLIP E PASSNO, KATHLEEN M PASSNO | |
April 05, 2006 | Docket Event | 04/05/2006: Mandatory Settlement Conference Statement received from RAYMOND J DI GUILIO, JEAN K DI GUILIO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.