Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Baxter Credit Union, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Mullins, Carl L, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 27, 2005 |
CategoryCollections |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time3764 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 16, 2015 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152 | |
September 21, 2005 | Docket Event | 09/21/2005: (S) COURT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE OR APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR PUBLICATION Hearing: COMPLETED | |
August 22, 2005 | Docket Event | 08/22/2005: COURT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON COMPLAINT of BAXTER CREDIT UNION AS TO ALL UNSERVED NAMED DEFENDANTS Hearing: COMPLETED | |
May 27, 2005 | Docket Event | 05/27/2005: Summons Issued; 30 day | |
May 27, 2005 | Docket Event | 05/27/2005: Case Information Sheet filed. Type of trial requested: COURT. Estimated time: 30 MIN. Mediation eligible NO | |
May 27, 2005 | Docket Event | 05/27/2005: Track assignment: Economic | |
May 27, 2005 | Docket Event | 05/27/2005: Complaint (Limited - prayer amount over $10,000.00) filed Receipt Number: 505270243 for $258.0 Filed By: BAXTER CREDIT UNION(Plaintiff) Refers To: MULLINS, CARL(Defendant) | |
May 27, 2005 | Docket Event | 05/27/2005: Amount prayed: PRINCIPAL $10117.53; INTEREST ATTORNEY FEES | |
May 27, 2005 | Docket Event | 05/27/2005: Declaration re: Court Assignment filed | |
May 27, 2005 | Docket Event | 05/27/2005: Vertical Case Assignment 41 - Ventura |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.