Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Delaney, Colin, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Ellison, David R., against Gray, Chuckie Wayne, represented by Stub, Jacob A.O., in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 27, 2005 |
CategoryPi/Pd/Wd - Auto |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Cycle Time2988 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed pursuant to GC 68152(d) 1 or 2 | |
June 13, 2006 | Docket Event | 06/13/2006: Request for Dismissal of Entire Action WITH Prejudice filed | |
February 01, 2006 | Docket Event | 02/01/2006: Case placed in arbitration: By Court Order. 06/19/06. | |
February 01, 2006 | Docket Event | 02/01/2006: Case deemed at issue based on CMS. Time estimate 4 day(s) | |
February 01, 2006 | Docket Event | 02/01/2006: Case Management Order - Unlimited Civil Case filed | |
December 14, 2005 | Docket Event | 12/14/2005: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (FILING OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT) Hearing: VACATED | |
December 02, 2005 | Docket Event | 12/02/2005: Case Management Statement filed by CHUCKIE WAYNE GRAY | |
November 29, 2005 | Docket Event | 11/29/2005: Case Management Statement filed by COLIN DELANEY. Status Hearing set on 12/14/05 at 8:10 in courtroom 22B is vacated | |
July 11, 2005 | Docket Event | 07/11/2005: Answer (Unlimited) to COMPLAINT of DELANEY filed by CHUCKIE WAYNE GRAY, represented by JACOB A.O. STUB Receipt Number: 507110343 for $232.0 | |
June 21, 2005 | Docket Event | 06/21/2005: Proof of Service (PERSONAL) of Summons and COMPLAINT of DELANEY served on CHUCKIE WAYNE GRAY with service date of 06/12/05 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.