Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Elder Abuse - Torts case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts with Reichert, Stanford E presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 11, 2017 |
CategoryPetition For Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeElder Abuse |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 03, 2017 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Reichert, Stanford E Comment HEARING RE: ELDER ABUSE RESTRAINING ORDER STANFORD E. REICHERT,JUDGE CLERK: ALMA HERNANDEZ COURT REPORTER LINDY CASTRO;13180 COURT ATTENDANT D MORENO - APPEARANCES: PETITIONER JOANNE MARY HABERMAN PRESENT RESPONDENT CHARLES CLARK PRESENT LYDIA MORSE PRESENT. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD WITNESS -- JOANNE MARY HABERMAN IS SWORN AND EXAMINED. WITNESS -- LYDIA MORSE IS SWORN AND EXAMINED. WITNESS -- CHARLES CLARK IS SWORN AND EXAMINED. - AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT : THE COURT DOES NOT FIND BY PREPONDERANCE OF EVIDENCE REASON FOR PERMANENT ELDER RESTRAINING ORDER TO BE ISSUED. PETITION DENIED - THE COURT ORDERS CHARLES CLARK TO PICK UP HIS REMAINING PROPERTY FROM MS. HABERMANS' HOME ON FRIDAY NOVEMBER 10, 2017 AT 10 A.M AND LEAVE MS. HABERMANS' HOME BY 11 A.M. FAILURE TO PICK UP HIS PROPERTY AT THE ALLOTED TIME WILL RESULT IN MS. HABERMAN KEEPING MR. CLARKS' PROPERTY. - THE COURT INFORMS MR. CLARK THAT IF HE DOES NOT STAY AWAY FROM MS. HABERMANS' PROPERTY SHE HAS THE RIGHT TO FILE A RESTRAINING ORDER AGAIN. - THE TEMPORARY ORDERS MADE ON 10/11/17 ARE HEREBY VACATED. - COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION - ELDER/DEPENDANT ADULT ABUSE OF JOANNE MARY HABERMAN ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE) DISPOSITION ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE) ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
November 03, 2017 | Hearing | Hearing Re: Original Type Hearing Re: Judicial Officer Reichert, Stanford E Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Held Comment HEARING RE: ELDER ABUSE RESTRAINING ORDER | |
October 25, 2017 | Hearing | Proof of Service Filed. Type of Service is: Comment PROOF OF SERVICE OF TRO FILED AS TO CHARLES CLARK. PARTY SERVED ON 10/13/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $0.00. | |
October 23, 2017 | Hearing | Response to Temporary Restraining Order Filed Comment RESPONSE TO TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER FILED BY CHARLES CLARK, PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER. | |
October 23, 2017 | Hearing | Proof of Service Filed Comment PROOF OF SERVICE OF RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ELDER ABUSE ORDER BY MAIL ON 10/17/17 AS TO JOANNE MARY HABERMAN, FILED. | |
October 11, 2017 | Hearing | Notice of Court Hearing - Elder or Dependent Adult Abuse Comment NOTICE OF COURT HEARING - ELDER OF DEPENDENT ADULTABUSE | |
October 11, 2017 | Hearing | Temp Restraining Order - Elder or Dependent Adult Abuse Comment TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER - ELDER OR DEPENDENT ADULT ABUSE | |
October 11, 2017 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Welch, J Michael Comment EX PARTE HEARING REGARDING ELDER OR DEPENDENT ADULT ABUSE JAMES MICHAEL WELCH,JUDGE CLERK: RACHELE ANDREWS COURT REPORTER CATHY ALBRITTON;7137 COURT ATTENDANT D NEWCOMB - APPEARANCES: JOANNE MARY HABERMAN PRESENT IN PRO PER. LYDIA MORSE PRESENT IN PRO PER. - PROCEEDINGS: PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER) EX-PARTE HEARING IS HELD. EX PARTE ORDERS GRANTED - THE SHERIFF WILL SERVE THIS ORDER WITHOUT CHARGE BECAUSE THE ORDER IS BASED ON UNLAWFUL VIOLENCE, A CREDIBLE THREAT OF VIOLENCE, OR STALKING. THE CLERK SHALL ENTER THIS ORDER INTO THE CALIFORNIA RESTRAINING AND PROTECTIVE ORDER SYSTEM (CARPOS) THROUGH THE CALIFORNIA LAW ENFORCEMENT TELECOMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM (CLETS) - HEARINGS: HEARING RE:ELDER ABUSE RESTRAINING ORDER SET FOR 11/03/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S35P. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
October 11, 2017 | Hearing | Declaration Regarding Ex Parte Notice Filed Comment DECLARATION REGARDING EX-PARTE NOTICE FILED. | |
October 11, 2017 | Hearing | Case Assigned for All Purposes Comment CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S35P |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.