Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
The People Of The State Of California, Ex Rel., filed a(n) Toxic,Environmental - Torts case represented by Cabraser, Elizabeth Joan, Lewis, Heather M., against America Petroleum Institute, Bp America Inc., Bp P.L.C, Chevron Corporation, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., (total of 15) See All represented by Boutrous , Jr, Theodore J, Dick, Joshua, Neuman, Andrea E, Thomson, William E., in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Ethan P. Schulman presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 15, 2023 |
CategoryToxic Tort/Environment |
Last RefreshedApril 30, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeToxic,Environmental |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a summons issued to the defendant, Exxon Mobil Corporation, by the plaintiff, The People of the State of California ex rel. Rob Bonta, Attorney General of California. The summons notifies the defendant that they have been sued and m...
NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: September 15, 2023ORDER DENYING COMPLEX DESIGNATION FOR FAILURE TO FILE APPLICATION REQUESTING DESIGNATION.
Date: October 24, 2023ORDER STAYING ACTION PENDING COORDINATION (TRANS# 71609103)
Date: December 12, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER ASSIGNING COORDINATION TRIAL JUDGE AND SETTING CMC (TRANSACTION ID # 72573053) FILED BY PLAINTIFF THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, EX REL. ROB BONTA, ATTORNEY GENERAL OF CALIFORNIA | |
February 23, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED ASSIGNING COORDINATION TRIAL JUDGE. (TRANSACTION ID # 72124815) FILED BY PLAINTIFF THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, EX REL. ROB BONTA, ATTORNEY GENERAL OF CALIFORNIA | |
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO FILE AMICUS BRIEF (NON PARTY) FILED BY OTHER BROSNAN, JOHN (NON PARTY, AMICUS CURIAE) | |
February 14, 2024 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO |
|
February 14, 2024 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - TRIAL COURTS
Judge: ETHAN P. SCHULMAN |
|
February 07, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 71984985) FILED BY PLAINTIFF THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, EX REL. ROB BONTA, ATTORNEY GENERAL OF CALIFORNIA | |
February 02, 2024 | Docket Event | COPYING FEES (2 PAGE, 2 CERTIFIED COPY) | |
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED ASSIGNING COORDINATION MOTION JUDGE. (TRANSACTION ID # 71755771) FILED BY PLAINTIFF THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, EX REL. ROB BONTA, ATTORNEY GENERAL OF CALIFORNIA | |
January 05, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 71752369) FILED BY PLAINTIFF THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, EX REL. ROB BONTA, ATTORNEY GENERAL OF CALIFORNIA | |
December 27, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED ASSIGNING COORDINATION MOTION JUDGE (TRANSACTION ID # 71698276) FILED BY PLAINTIFF THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, EX REL. ROB BONTA, ATTORNEY GENERAL OF CALIFORNIA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.