Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Milon, Angie, Munguia, John, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Pro Per, against Does 1 To 20, Munguia, John, Riedel, Dorothy, Trad'R Sam, A California Partnership, represented by Mcann, Trevor, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with RICHARD B. ULMER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRICHARD B. ULMER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 16, 2023 |
CategoryContract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedFebruary 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a first amended cross-complaint for equitable relief and damages filed by John Munguia and Trad'r Sam against Dorothy Riedel and Angie Milon. The complaint alleges breach of fiduciary duties by Riedel and Milon towards Munguia and T...
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 29, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | Matter on the Law & Motion Calendar for Thursday, February 29, 2024, Line 10, DEFENDANTS JOHN MUNGUIA and TRAD'R SAM, A CALIFORNIA PARTNERSHIP's First Motion For Order Compelling Responses To Written ... | |
February 07, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | Matter on the Discovery Calendar for Wednesday, February 7, 2024 line 10, (TO BE EHARD AT 1:30 P.M. BY JUDGE PRO TEM GREEN) DEFENDANTS JOHN MUNGUIA, TRAD'R SAM, A CALIFORNIA PARTNERSHIP'S Motion For O... | |
January 24, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | Matter on the Discovery Calendar for Wednesday, Jan-24-2024 (at 1:30 p.m.), Line 13, DEFENDANTS JOHN MUNGUIA, TRAD'R SAM, A CALIFORNIA PARTNERSHIP's First Motion For Order Compelling Responses To Writ... | |
January 19, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | Matter on the Discovery Calendar for Friday, Jan-19-2024, Line 9, DEFENDANTS JOHN MUNGUIA, TRAD'R SAM'S, A CALIFORNIA PARTNERSHIP Motion For Order Compelling Responses To Written Discoveyr And To Have... | |
November 15, 2023 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO |
|
October 18, 2023 | Hearing |
DEMURRER to Amended CROSS COMPLAINT
Judge: RICHARD B. ULMER |
|
September 08, 2023 | Hearing |
Notice Of Motion And Motion For Preliminary Injunction
Judge: RICHARD B. ULMER |
|
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION 302, DEFENDANTS JOHN MUNGUIA, TRAD'R SAM, A CALIFORNIA PARTNERSHIP'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION IS CONTINUED TO BE HEARD BY JUDGE QUINN ON SEPTEMBER 8, 2023. JUDGE: RICHARD B. ULMER JR., CLERK: M. GOODMAN, NOT REPORTED. (302/RBU) | |
August 23, 2023 | Hearing |
Notice Of Motion And Motion For Preliminary Injunction
Judge: RICHARD B. ULMER |
|
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR AUG-23-2023 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.