Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Mulhorn, Ashley, against Bartholomew, Blake, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 15, 2023 |
CategoryExempt Collections (Rule 3.740) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. against an individual named Blake Bartholomew. The complaint alleges a breach of contract by Bartholomew. The complaint states that on or about August 11, 2019, there was a written or...
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2024 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. | |
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event | COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $960.33 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED ($.00 ON INTEREST, $960.33 ON PRINCIPAL), $.00 INTEREST, $.00 COSTS, (TRANSACTION ID # 210059591) FILED BY PLAINTIFF WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. | |
November 14, 2023 | Docket Event | CRC 3.740 REVIEW - JUDGMENT ON FILE | |
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event | DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 210049501) FILED BY PLAINTIFF WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. | |
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event | UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 585(1) C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT BARTHOLOMEW, BLAKE $10,410.36 PRINCIPAL, $650.00 ATTORNEY FEES, $445.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $11,505.36, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 210049501) | |
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event | DECLARATION RE: NON-MILITARY STATUS (TRANSACTION ID # 210049501) FILED BY PLAINTIFF WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. | |
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, CLERK'S JUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $445.00 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 (TRANSACTION ID # 210049501) (TRANSACTION ID # 210049501) AS TO DEFENDANT BARTHOLOMEW, BLAKE | |
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event | DECLARATION RE: ATTORNEY FEES AND MAILING DEMAND PURSUANT TO CCP 1033 (TRANSACTION ID # 210049501) FILED BY PLAINTIFF WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. | |
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS (TRANSACTION ID # 210043641) AS TO DEFENDANT BARTHOLOMEW, BLAKE | |
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 210040281), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. SERVED MAY-27-2023, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT BARTHOLOMEW, BLAKE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.