Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Carlson-Krzywonos, Rebecca, Krzywonos, Stephen, Rose, Christopher, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Carroll, Bryce, Potestio, Danielle E., against Does 1-20 Inclusive, Rose, Christopher, represented by Spector, Ross Adam, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with JOSEPH M. QUINN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 26, 2023 |
CategoryContract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is filed by Rebecca Carlson-Krzywonos and Stephen Krzywonos against Christopher Rose, an individual doing business as Rose Architecture, and Does 1-20. The plaintiffs allege several causes of action, including breach of contract, inten...
NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: April 26, 2023ORDER ON DEFENDANT CHRISTOPHER ROSE'S DEMURRER TO SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION IN COMPLAINT.
Date: August 31, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 23, 2024 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO |
|
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event | REFUND/REIMBURSEMENT OF $435.00 FOR TRANSACTION (), PAYABLE TO ROSS SPECTOR, WARRANT #38207597, DATED DEC-22-2023 | |
December 20, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | Set for Discovery on Wednesday, December 20, 2023 Line 2, 2-DEFENDANT CHRISTOPHER ROSE's Motion 1) To Compel Amended Responses To Form Interrogatories And Request For Production Of Documents; And 2) F... | |
December 20, 2023 | Hearing |
Motion 1) To Compel Amended Responses To Form Interrogatories And Request For Production Of Documents; And 2) For Imposition Of Monetary Sanctions Against Plaintiff Stephen Krzywonos
Judge: RICHARD B. ULMER |
|
December 20, 2023 | Hearing |
Motion 1) To Compel Amended Responses To Form Interrogatories And Request For Production Of Documents; And 2) For Imposition Of Monetary Sanctions Against Plaintiff Rebecca Carlson-Krzywonos
Judge: RICHARD B. ULMER |
|
December 20, 2023 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR DEC-20-2023 09:00 AM FOR DEPT 302 | |
December 20, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY 302, 2-DEFENDANT CHRISTOPHER ROSE'S MOTION 1) TO COMPEL AMENDED RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS; AND 2) FOR IMPOSITION OF MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF STEPHEN KRZYWONOS. OFF CALENDAR. MOTION WITHDRAWN NOVEMBER 27, 2023. JUDGE PRO TEM: JOHN PAUL DEOL, CLERK: M. GOODMAN, NOT REPORTED. (302/JPT) | |
December 20, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY 302, 1-DEFENDANT CHRISTOPHER ROSE'S MOTION 1) TO COMPEL AMENDED RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS; AND 2) FOR IMPOSITION OF MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF REBECCA CARLSON-KRZYWONOS. OFF CALENDAR. MOTION WITHDRAWN NOVEMBER 27, 2023. JUDGE PRO TEM: JOHN PAUL DEOL, CLERK: M. GOODMAN, NOT REPORTED. (302/JPT) | |
November 29, 2023 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO |
|
November 27, 2023 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION 1) TO COMPEL AMENDED RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS; AND 2) FOR IMPOSITION OF MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF STEPHEN KRZYWONOS (NOTICES) (TRANSACTION ID # 210054781) FILED BY DEFENDANT ROSE, CHRISTOPHER AN INDIVIDUAL AND DOING BUSINESS AS ROSE ARCHITECTURE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.