Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Nguyen, Thien, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Jacobson, Kevin Y, against American Honda Motor Co., Inc., A California, Does 1 Through 10, Inclusive, represented by Herzog, Kella A., in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with RICHARD B. ULMER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 09, 2023 |
CategoryContract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedApril 12, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
SUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 100190472) TO PLAINTIFF NGUYEN, THIEN AN INDIVIDUAL
Date: February 15, 2023NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: February 09, 2023STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: June 08, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 02, 2025 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO |
|
April 12, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | Matter on the Discovery Calendar for Friday, April 12, 2024 line 8, PLAINTIFF THIEN NGUYEN'S Motion To Compel Further Responses To Plaintiffs Request For Production Of Documents, Set Two Pro Tem Judge... | |
March 28, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | Matter on the Discovery Calendar for Thursday, March 28, 2024 line 3, PLAINTIFF THIEN NGUYEN'S Motion To Compel Further Responses To Plaintiffs Request For Production Of Documents, Set Two Continued t... | |
March 14, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | Matter on the Law & Motion Calendar for Thursday, March 14, 2024, Line 6, PLAINTIFF THIEN NGUYEN's Motion To Compel Further Responses To Plaintiffs Request For Production Of Documents, Set Two. Transf... | |
March 14, 2024 | Hearing |
Motion To Compel Further Responses To Plaintiffs Request For Production Of Documents, Set Two
Judge: RICHARD B. ULMER |
|
January 25, 2024 | Docket Event | SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET TWO (TRANSACTION ID # 100226535) FILED BY PLAINTIFF NGUYEN, THIEN AN INDIVIDUAL | |
January 25, 2024 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF DAVID DERDERIAN, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET TWO (TRANSACTION ID # 100226535) FILED BY PLAINTIFF NGUYEN, THIEN AN INDIVIDUAL | |
January 25, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET TWO (TRANSACTION ID # 100226535) (TRANSACTION ID # 100226535) FILED BY PLAINTIFF NGUYEN, THIEN AN INDIVIDUAL HEARING SET FOR MAR-14-2024 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 | |
December 07, 2023 | Hearing |
Notice Of Motion To Compel Plaintiff'S Further Responses To Ahm'S Requests For Production Of Documents And Request For Sanctions; Memorandum And Points Of Authorities In Support Thereof
Judge: RICHARD B. ULMER |
|
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY, 302,DEFENDANT AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO. INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO AHM'S REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS IS OFF CALENDAR PER REQUEST OF MOVING PARTY. (EMAIL 11/30/23) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.