Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
American Express National Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Baldaro, Aaron N., against Does 1 To 10, Inclusive, Michael Lin A K A Michael J Lin, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Anne-Christine Massullo presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 30, 2023 |
CategoryCommon Counts/Open Book Account/Collections |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a contract dispute between American Express National Bank (the plaintiff) and Michael Lin (the defendant). The plaintiff alleges that the defendant became indebted to them within the last four years. The specific amount of the debt ...
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JAN-09-2024 IS OFF CALENDAR. JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.
Date: December 20, 2023NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: January 30, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 210027309) TO PLAINTIFF AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK
Date: February 01, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 09, 2024 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO |
|
December 20, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JAN-09-2024 IS OFF CALENDAR. JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
December 14, 2023 | Docket Event | DECLARATION IN RESPONSE TO THE COURTS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (TRANSACTION ID # 100222453) FILED BY PLAINTIFF AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK | |
November 15, 2023 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO |
|
November 02, 2023 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S SUMMARY OF THE CASE (TRANSACTION ID # 100218096) FILED BY PLAINTIFF AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK | |
November 02, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, CLERK'S JUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $822.09 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 (TRANSACTION ID # 100218096) AS TO DEFENDANT MICHAEL LIN A/K/A MICHAEL J LIN | |
November 02, 2023 | Docket Event | DECLARATION IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 585 (TRANSACTION ID # 100218096) FILED BY PLAINTIFF AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK | |
November 02, 2023 | Docket Event | UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 585(1) C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT MICHAEL LIN A/K/A MICHAEL J LIN $74,769.49 PRINCIPAL, $822.09 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $75,591.58, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100218096) | |
November 02, 2023 | Docket Event | DECLARATION FOR AN ORDER PERMITTING THE USE OF COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS IN OBTAINING DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT CIVIL (TRANSACTION ID # 100218096) FILED BY PLAINTIFF AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK | |
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100216559) FILED BY PLAINTIFF AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.