Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Dunn, Kaitlin Kelly, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Jacobson, Kevin Y, against Does 1 Through 10, Inclusive, General Motors Llc,, represented by Mcbride, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Anne-Christine Massullo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAnne-Christine Massullo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 27, 2023 |
CategoryContract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint alleges violations of the Song-Beverly Act by General Motors LLC. The plaintiff, Kaitlin Kelly Dunn, is claiming a breach of express warranty and a breach of implied warranty. The specific violation of the Song-Beverly Act mentioned is...
SUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 100189110) TO PLAINTIFF DUNN, KAITLIN KELLY
Date: January 31, 2023NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: January 27, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2024 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO |
|
June 28, 2023 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO |
|
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 210040625) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS LLC JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS | |
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR APR-29-2024 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON JUN-28-2023 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100202282) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DUNN, KAITLIN KELLY JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS | |
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | JURY FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 100202282) DEPOSITED BY PLAINTIFF DUNN, KAITLIN KELLY | |
May 24, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 210037815) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS LLC JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS | |
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 210030207) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS LLC | |
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100189790) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DUNN, KAITLIN KELLY SERVED FEB-01-2023, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 100189110) TO PLAINTIFF DUNN, KAITLIN KELLY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.