Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Wate, Shane T., against Burrell, Kenneth, represented by Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Garrett L. Wong presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGarrett L. Wong Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2023 |
CategoryExempt Collections (Rule 3.740) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is filed in the Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco. The plaintiff, Discover Bank, is a FDIC insured Delaware State Bank. The defendant, Kenneth Burrell, is a natural person residing in the same judicial district. The...
WITNESS LIST (TRANSACTION ID # 210057202) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DISCOVER BANK
Date: December 21, 2023DECLARATION OF PROPER VENUE (TRANSACTION ID # 210026211) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DISCOVER BANK
Date: January 17, 2023TRIAL BRIEF (TRANSACTION ID # 210057202) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DISCOVER BANK
Date: December 21, 2023ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT BURRELL, KENNETH
Date: February 24, 2023CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 210026211) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DISCOVER BANK
Date: January 17, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 210026211) TO PLAINTIFF DISCOVER BANK
Date: January 17, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF DISCOVER BANK RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT BURRELL, KENNETH $9,686.31 PRINCIPAL, $296.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $9,982.31, SEE SCANNED DOC | |
January 08, 2024 | Hearing |
COURT TRIAL
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
|
January 08, 2024 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR COURT
Judge: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO |
|
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM COURT TRIAL CALENDAR SET FOR JAN-08-2024 - JUDGMENT ON FILE. JUDGE: GARRETT L. WONG, CLERK: K. SEPTIEN, NOT REPORTED, (504). | |
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event | MASTER COURT TRIAL CALENDAR OF JAN-08-2024 ASSIGNED TO COURT TRIAL CALENDAR ON JAN-08-2024 AT 10:20 AM IN DEPT. 504, JUDGE GARRETT L. WONG. SUNNY LEE, ESQ. APPEARING FOR PLAINTIFF. DEFENDANT KENNETH BURRELL APPEARING AS SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT. CASE DID NOT SETTLE IN THE HALLWAY. TIME ESTIMATE: 30 MINUTES. JUDGE: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206) | |
December 21, 2023 | Docket Event | WITNESS LIST (TRANSACTION ID # 210057202) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DISCOVER BANK | |
December 21, 2023 | Docket Event | TRIAL BRIEF (TRANSACTION ID # 210057202) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DISCOVER BANK | |
December 21, 2023 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 210057202) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DISCOVER BANK | |
December 21, 2023 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AND DISBURSEMENTS, $296.00 TOTAL COSTS, MATURE DATE JAN-10-2023,, (TRANSACTION ID # 210057202) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DISCOVER BANK | |
December 14, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE REQUESTING AND REQUIRING PARTIES TO ATTEND TRIAL (CCP SECTION 1987(B)) (TRANSACTION ID # 210056578) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DISCOVER BANK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.