Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
O'Leary, James, O'Leary, Margaret, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Donadio, David R, against Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Asbestos Corporation Limited, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc., Does 1 Through 800, Inclusive, As Required By, (total of 13) See All represented by Bailey, Bobbie R., Goetz, Andy J., Johnson, Derek S., Langbord, Peter Bennett, Talarico, Amy J., (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Samuel K. Feng presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2023 |
CategoryAsbestos |
Last RefreshedMarch 19, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a proof of service of summons document filed in the Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco. The plaintiff/petitioner is James O'Leary and Margaret O'Leary, and the defendant/respondent is General Electric Company et. ...
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 71765079) FILED BY DEFENDANT IMO INDUSTRIES INC.
Date: January 08, 2024SUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 71518243) TO PLAINTIFF O'LEARY, JAMES O'LEARY, MARGARET
Date: December 01, 2023NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: November 30, 2023ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 71804551) FILED BY DEFENDANT SHELL USA, INC.
Date: January 12, 2024ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 71820708) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Date: January 17, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 19, 2024 | Hearing |
ASBESTOS CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
March 19, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | (Part 2 of 2) (Tentative ruling continued from previous entry) 9. A further case management conference is set for May 21, 2024 at 1:30 p.m. a. Case management conference statements are not required. b... | |
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 71832001), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF O'LEARY, JAMES O'LEARY, MARGARET SERVED DEC-13-2023, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT IMO INDUSTRIES INC. | |
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 71832001), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF O'LEARY, JAMES O'LEARY, MARGARET SERVED DEC-13-2023, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC | |
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 71832001), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF O'LEARY, JAMES O'LEARY, MARGARET SERVED DEC-13-2023, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT SHELL USA, INC. (FKA SHELL OIL COMPANY) | |
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 71832001), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF O'LEARY, JAMES O'LEARY, MARGARET SERVED DEC-13-2023, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT RILEY POWER INC. | |
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 71832001), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF O'LEARY, JAMES O'LEARY, MARGARET SERVED DEC-13-2023, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY | |
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 71820708) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY | |
January 12, 2024 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 71804551) FILED BY DEFENDANT SHELL USA, INC. | |
January 11, 2024 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 71795276) FILED BY DEFENDANT CHEVRON U.S.A. INC. , A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.