Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Stinnett, Fred, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Donadio, David R, against Asbestos Corporation Limited, Collins Electrical Company, Inc., Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc., C V Supply, Inc., Dillingham Construction N.A., Inc., (total of 10) See All represented by Aspericueta, Erika R., Bergstrom, Emily D, Recendez, Melisa, Talarico, Amy J., in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Samuel K. Feng presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 25, 2023 |
CategoryAsbestos |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco. The plaintiff, Fred Stinnett, is filing a complaint for survival and wrongful death related to asbestos exposure. The defendants named in the compl...
NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: September 25, 2023ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 71409839) FILED BY DEFENDANT ITT LLC
Date: November 15, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 17, 2024 | Hearing |
ASBESTOS CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
January 22, 2024 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 71845341), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF STINNETT, FRED , AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF JAMES STINNETT, DECEASED SERVED OCT-10-2023, CERTIFIED OR REGISTERED MAIL - OUT OF STATE AS TO DEFENDANT ITT LLC | |
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 71811481) FILED BY DEFENDANT COLLINS ELECTRICAL COMPANY, INC. | |
January 12, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 71803186) FILED BY DEFENDANT DILLINGHAM CONSTRUCTION N.A., INC. | |
January 04, 2024 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF FRED STINNETT UNDER C.C.P. 377.32 (TRANSACTION ID # 71739135) FILED BY PLAINTIFF STINNETT, FRED , AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF JAMES STINNETT, DECEASED | |
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 71651820), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF STINNETT, FRED , AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF JAMES STINNETT, DECEASED SERVED OCT-11-2023, CERTIFIED OR REGISTERED MAIL - OUT OF STATE AS TO DEFENDANT CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC. | |
November 17, 2023 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 71437601) FILED BY DEFENDANT DILLINGHAM CONSTRUCTION N.A., INC. | |
November 15, 2023 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 71409839) FILED BY DEFENDANT ITT LLC | |
November 15, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 71405595), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF STINNETT, FRED , AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF JAMES STINNETT, DECEASED SERVED OCT-09-2023, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY | |
November 15, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 71405595), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF STINNETT, FRED , AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF JAMES STINNETT, DECEASED SERVED OCT-11-2023, CERTIFIED OR REGISTERED MAIL - OUT OF STATE AS TO DEFENDANT CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.