Case Last Refreshed: 9 hours ago
Eastwood Development Inc., Lee & Georgiou Inc. Dba Georgiou Const, North South Plumbing Inc., Luminous Ion Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Miller, Michael Charles, against 367 Liberty Llc, 367 Liberty Street, Llc Erroneously Sued Herein As, Amber Flooring Inc., Amber Flooring, Inc., Chiao, Vicki, (total of 27) See All represented by Akay, Douglas N, Arneal, Richard G., Constantino, Matthew S., Eum, David, Mcconville, Kevin J., (total of 20) See All in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with GARRETT L. WONG presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 09, 2020 |
CategoryContract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF LUMINOUS ION LLC
Date: July 10, 2020NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: July 09, 2020ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100150989) FILED BY DEFENDANT HYDRONICS, INC.
Date: December 29, 2021NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 67209275) FILED BY ATTORNEY RHOADES, RALPH
Date: January 04, 2022ORDER AFTER HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION
Date: January 10, 2022ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEACVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: April 19, 2022AMENDMENT TO CROSS COMPLAINT CROSS DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS ROE 1 TO BE ARREOLA GLASS
Date: February 07, 2023ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SEVER CROSS-COMPLAINT OF EASTWOOD DEVELOPMENT INC.
Date: June 29, 2023DECLARATION REGARDING VENUE (TRANSACTION ID # 100185934) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LUMINOUS ION LLC
Date: December 22, 2022DECLARATION REGARDING VENUE (TRANSACTION ID # 100185930) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LUMINOUS ION LLC
Date: December 22, 2022ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE
Date: September 07, 2023AMENDMENT TO CROSS COMPLAINT CROSS DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS ROE 9 TO BE MC PLASTERING
Date: February 07, 2023AMENDMENT TO CROSS COMPLAINT CROSS DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS ROE 7 TO BE KENWOOD CABINETRY, INC.
Date: February 07, 2023AMENDMENT TO CROSS COMPLAINT DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS ROE 12 TO BE REDWOOD LATH & PLASTER
Date: February 07, 2023ORDER ER: MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY ACTION PENDING ARBITRATION
Date: April 07, 2021DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 200016829) FILED BY DEFENDANT EASTWOOD DEVELOPMENT INC.
Date: September 22, 2020ORDER AND STIPULATION OF REFERENCE TO SPECIAL MASTER
Date: October 13, 2020SUMMONS ISSUED TO CROSS COMPLAINANT LEE & GEORGIOU INC. DBA GEORGIOU CONST
Date: November 10, 2020ORDER DENYING MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS
Date: October 27, 2020ORDER -PRE-TRIAL ORDER NO.1 RE: PLEADINGS DISCOVERY, PRE-TRIAL SETTLEMENT MATTERS
Date: December 09, 2020ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION
Date: March 17, 2022ORDER - PRE-TRIAL ORDER NO. 3 RE: DISCOVERY
Date: May 10, 2023ORDER ON STIPULATION FOR RELIEF FROM REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT
Date: May 02, 2023DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 68197894) FILED BY DEFENDANT NORTH SOUTH PLUMBING INC.
Date: September 30, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 68197894) TO CROSS COMPLAINANT NORTH SOUTH PLUMBING INC.
Date: October 03, 2022NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 66987586) FILED BY ATTORNEY AKAY, DOUGLAS N
Date: October 04, 2021DECLARATION RE: VENUE (TRANSACTION ID # 100184129) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LUMINOUS ION LLC
Date: December 05, 2022AMENDMENT TO CROSS COMPLAINT CROSS DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS ROE 2 TO BE CBW DOORS, INC.
Date: February 07, 2023ORDER ON STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT (RE: MC PLASTERING CO., INC.)
Date: July 18, 2023ORDER - PRE-TRIAL ORDER NO. 4 RE: DISCOVERY
Date: November 16, 2023DECLARATION REGARDING VENUE FILED BY PLAINTIFF LUMINOUS ION LLC
Date: December 22, 2022ORDER - PRE-TRIAL ORDER NO. 2 (RE: DISCOVERY)
Date: January 12, 2023AMENDMENT TO CROSS COMPLAINT CROSS DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS ROE 6 TO BE HEAVYLUX, INC.
Date: February 07, 2023ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT
Date: March 09, 2023ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE MOTION TO AMEND THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO IDENTIFY DOE DEFENDANTS
Date: February 05, 2021ORDER GRANTING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT OF PAIGE STRUCTURAL GLASS CO.
Date: July 18, 2022ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL
Date: June 29, 2022AMENDMENT TO CROSS COMPLAINT CROSS DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS ROE 11 TO BE OSCAR DRYWALL
Date: February 07, 2023AMENDMENT TO CROSS COMPLAINT CROSS DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS ROE 8 TO BE LEVITAN TILE
Date: February 07, 2023MINUTE ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S JUNE 8, 2022 EX-PARTE APPLICATION
Date: June 09, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 05, 2024 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO |
|
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 72877191) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT REICA CONSTRUCTION, INC. | |
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT OF REICA CONSTRUCTION, INC., TO CROSS-COMPLAINANT EASTWOOD DEVELOPMENT, INC.'S CROSS-COMPLAINT | |
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | FEE PAID ON STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT OF REICA CONSTRUCTION, INC., TO CROSS-COMPLAINANT EASTWOOD DEVELOPMENT, INC.'S CROSS-COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 72680534) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT REICA CONSTRUCTION, INC. | |
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY WITHIN FIRM (TRANSACTION ID # 210072419) FILED BY DEFENDANT NORTH SOUTH PLUMBING INC. | |
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY AND FIRM ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 72487138) (TRANSACTION ID # 72487138) FILED BY DEFENDANT HYDRONICS, INC. | |
November 16, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER - PRE-TRIAL ORDER NO. 4 RE: DISCOVERY | |
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF MICHAEL C MILLER IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR APPROVAL OF PRE TRIAL ORDER NO. 4 (TRANSACTION ID # 100219145) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LUMINOUS ION LLC | |
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR COURT APPROVAL OF PRE TRIAL ORDER NO. 4 (TRANSACTION ID # 100219145) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LUMINOUS ION LLC | |
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | EX PARTE APPLICATION TO OBTAIN COURT APPROVAL OF PRE TRIAL ORDER NO. 4 (TRANSACTION ID # 100219145) FILED BY PLAINTIFF LUMINOUS ION LLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.