Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Alsaedi, Mohammed, Obayes, Farqad Mahdi, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Fareed, Rohollah Sam, Simon, Robert T, against Does 1 To 10, Westbrook, David, Westbrook, Joshua, represented by Hicks, Randolph Steven, Nelch, Henry Gregory, Shevtsov, Daniel, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Samuel K. Feng presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 19, 2020 |
CategoryPersonal Injury/Property Damage - Vehicle Related |
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is a response from defendants Joshua Westbrook and David Westbrook to the unverified complaint filed by plaintiffs Mohammed Alsaedi and Farqad Mahdi Obayes. The defendants deny all the allegations made by the plaintiffs and state that ...
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: June 14, 2022NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 66900087) FILED BY ATTORNEY SIMON, ROBERT T
Date: September 02, 2021NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR AUG-02-2021 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206.
Date: November 20, 2020NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: June 19, 2020SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF ALSAEDI, MOHAMMED OBAYES, FARQAD MAHDI
Date: June 30, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | Matter on the Discovery Calendar for Friday, December 8, 2023 line 3, (Specially set to be heard at 1:30 p.m. by Judge Pro Tem James Fleming) PLAINTIFFS MOHAMMED ALSAEDI, FARQAD OBAYES' Motion And Not... | |
March 06, 2023 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
August 15, 2022 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
June 14, 2022 | Hearing |
MOTION TO CONTINUE JURY TRIAL
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL | |
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event | MASTER MOTION CALENDAR ON JUN-14-2022 IN 206, PLAINTIFFS MOHAMMED ALSAEDI AND FARQAD MAHDI OBAYES' MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL WAS HEARD. APPEARANCES VIA COURTCALL BY SAM FAREED, ESQ. FOR MOVING PARTY PLAINTIFFS; H. GREGORY NELCH, ESQ. FOR DEFENDANTS JOSHUA WESTBROOK AND DAVID WESTBROOK. THE COURT GRANTED THE MOTION. THE TRIAL DATE OF 08/15/22 IS CONTINUED TO 03/06/23 IN DEPT. 206 AT 9:30 AM PER STIPULATION. ALL DISCOVERY TO TRACK THE NEW TRIAL DATE. ORDER SIGNED IN OPEN COURT. MR. FAREED TO SERVE ORDER. PARTIES WAIVED NOTICE OF THE NEW TRIAL DATE. JUDGE: SAMUEL K. FENG; MATTER NOT REPORTED (206) | |
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event | MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR AUG-15-2022 CONTINUED TO MASTER CALENDAR JURY ON MAR-06-2023 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. (206) | |
June 07, 2022 | Docket Event | REPLY ISO PL MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL (COMMENT) (TRANSACTION ID # 210008764) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ALSAEDI, MOHAMMED OBAYES, FARQAD MAHDI | |
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF H. GREGORY NELCH IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL WITH NEW DEVELOPMENT AND PROPOSED TRIAL DATE IN MARCH 2023 (TRANSACTION ID # 100165709) FILED BY DEFENDANT WESTBROOK, JOSHUA WESTBROOK, DAVID | |
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO CONTINUE JURY TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 210007614) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ALSAEDI, MOHAMMED OBAYES, FARQAD MAHDI HEARING SET FOR JUN-14-2022 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 206 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.