Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Rox Australia Vf Pty Ltd,, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Wright, Edward J, against Swyft Inc., A Delaware Corporation, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Samuel K. Feng presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 16, 2020 |
CategoryContract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This complaint is a First Amended Complaint for Recognition of Foreign Money Judgment filed by ROX Australia VF Pty Ltd against Swyft Inc. The complaint alleges that ROX initiated a civil action in the Supreme Court of NSW, Australia, against Swyft f...
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF FEB-15-2022 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.
Date: January 28, 2022NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: June 16, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 15, 2022 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF FEB-15-2022 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event | DECLARATION RE OSC (TRANSACTION ID # 100151399) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROX AUSTRALIA VF PTY LTD, AN AUSTRALIAN CORPORATION | |
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100151400) | |
December 15, 2021 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100149136) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROX AUSTRALIA VF PTY LTD, AN AUSTRALIAN CORPORATION ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 1.0 DAYS | |
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR FEB-15-2022 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT. THE DEC-15-2021 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
September 15, 2021 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF SEP-15-2021 CONTINUED TO DEC-15-2021 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR PLAINTIFF TO OBTAIN DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT(S). "NOTE: ONLY A REQUEST FOR DEFAULT WAS ENTERED ON SEPTEMBER 28, 2020. PLEASE PROCEED WITH DEFAULT JUDGMENT." NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100139608) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROX AUSTRALIA VF PTY LTD, AN AUSTRALIAN CORPORATION ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 1.0 DAYS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.