Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Alice Phelan Sullivan Corporation, White House Ventures Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Cavallo, Gregory S., against Alice Phelan Sullivan Corporation, Does 1 To 100, represented by Flaherty, Timothy Martin, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Samuel K. Feng presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 03, 2020 |
CategoryContract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This complaint is a cross-complaint filed by the defendant, Alice Phelan Sullivan Corporation (APS), against the plaintiff, White House Ventures, LLC (WHV), and Roes 1-10. APS alleges that WHV breached the lease agreement between the parties by faili...
ORDER ON STIPULATED EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: December 10, 2020TRIAL BRIEF (TRANSACTION ID # 66972527) FILED BY DEFENDANT ALICE PHELAN SULLIVAN CORPORATION
Date: September 28, 2021EXHIBIT LIST (TRANSACTION ID # 66972527) FILED BY DEFENDANT ALICE PHELAN SULLIVAN CORPORATION
Date: September 28, 2021MINUTES FOR JUL-21-2021 1:30 PM
Date: July 21, 2021WITNESS LIST (TRANSACTION ID # 66972527) FILED BY DEFENDANT ALICE PHELAN SULLIVAN CORPORATION
Date: September 28, 2021MINUTES FOR APR-20-2021 2:00 PM
Date: April 20, 2021MINUTES FOR SEP-15-2021 4:30 PM
Date: September 15, 2021MINUTES FOR AUG-16-2021 3:00 PM
Date: August 16, 2021MINUTES FOR SEP-08-2021 4:30 PM
Date: September 08, 2021MINUTES FOR MAY-21-2021 9:30 AM
Date: May 21, 2021MINUTES FOR JUN-30-2021 9:00 AM
Date: June 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 24, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED BY COURT AT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING MAY-24-2022 AT 10:30 AM PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
May 24, 2022 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
May 24, 2022 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR MAY-24-2022 10:30 AM FOR DEPT 610 | |
April 12, 2022 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF APR-12-2022 CONTINUED TO MAY-24-2022 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
December 30, 2021 | Hearing |
COURT TRIAL
Judge: HAROLD E. KAHN |
|
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT TRIAL SET FOR DEC-30-2021 VACATED. CASE SETTLED ON DECEMBER 16, 2021. SET TO OSC DISMISSAL DATE ON APRIL 12, 2022 IN DEPT 610. ALL COUNSEL APPEARED VIA ZOOM. JUDGE: HAROLD KAHN, CLERK: R. GUMPAL, REPORTED BY: TERESA KENWORTHY, CSR NO. 6673, TEL: (530) 217-3811, E-MAIL: TKENWORTHY@GMAIL.COM, (505). | |
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM COURT TRIAL CALENDAR SET FOR DEC-16-2021 - CASE SETTLED. ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 610 ON APR-12-2022 AT 10:30 AM FOR DISMISSAL PER CRC 3.1385. ALL COUNSEL APPEARED VIA ZOOM. JUDGE: HAROLD KAHN, CLERK: R. GUMPAL, REPORTED BY: TERESA KENWORTHY, CSR NO. 6673, TEL: (530) 217-3811, E-MAIL: TKENWORTHY@GMAIL.COM, (505). | |
December 16, 2021 | Hearing |
Motion To Enforce Termination Of Settlement Or In The Alternative Motion To Deem Settlement Agreement Unenforceable
Judge: HAROLD E. KAHN |
|
December 16, 2021 | Hearing |
COURT TRIAL
Judge: HAROLD E. KAHN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.