Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Bhatt, Kailash, Seljak, Maria, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Larsen, Brian L, against Does 1 To 10, Seljak, Maria, represented by Rickett, Rebecca, Santana, Helen L, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Samuel K. Feng presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 03, 2020 |
CategoryPersonal Injury/Property Damage - Vehicle Related |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is a cross-complaint filed in the Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco. The case number is CGC-20-582658. The cross-complainant is Maria Seljak, and the cross-defendant is Jody Togonon. The cross-complaint alleges caus...
ORDER TO ARBITRATION SENT BY COURT
Date: January 11, 2021NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 100123940) FILED BY ATTORNEY RICKETT, REBECCA
Date: February 16, 2021PLAINTIFF(S) REJECTED PROPOSED ARBITRATOR JOHN SKINNER WARNLOF.
Date: February 05, 2021PANEL OF ARBITRATORS ASSIGNED. REJECTION DATE FEB-11-2021.
Date: February 01, 2021ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 66074190) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT TOGONON, JODY
Date: November 02, 2020SUMMONS ISSUED TO CROSS COMPLAINANT SELJAK, MARIA
Date: June 03, 2020NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: February 03, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE IS REMOVED FROM ARBITRATION, DISMISSAL ON FILE. | |
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY SELJAK, MARIA (TRANSACTION ID # 66964526) (TRANSACTION ID # 66964526) | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE EACH PARTY TO BEAR THEIR OWN FEES AND COSTS.(TRANSACTION ID # 66880208) | |
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event | STIPULATION TO ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (TRANSACTION ID # 66671707) FILED BY SELJAK, MARIA BHATT, KAILASH | |
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 66671707): SANTANA, HELEN L SUBSTITUTED FOR RICKETT, REBECCA AS ATTORNEY FOR SELJAK, MARIA | |
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 66405193): SANTANA, HELEN L SUBSTITUTED FOR RICKETT, REBECCA AS ATTORNEY FOR SELJAK, MARIA | |
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event | ARBITRATOR JOHN DOUGLAS WINER APPOINTED. ARBITRATOR'S JURISDICTION FEB-17-2021 THROUGH MAY-18-2021. | |
February 17, 2021 | Hearing |
ARBITRATOR JURISDICTION CALENDAR LIST
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 100123940) FILED BY ATTORNEY RICKETT, REBECCA | |
February 11, 2021 | Hearing |
ORDER TO ARBITRATION CALENDAR LIST
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.