Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Doe, Jane, Roe, Jane, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Astanehe, Michael, against Airbnb, Inc, Anderson, Cathryn, Anderson, Stanley, Does 1 To 20, Inclusive, represented by Crane, Alison M., Floyd, Michele, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Samuel K. Feng presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 22, 2020 |
CategoryWrongful Eviction |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
This complaint was electronically filed in the Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco on June 2, 2020. The clerk of the court, Vanessa Wu, processed the filing. The text does not provide any specific information about the nature of the...
NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: January 22, 2020NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 65965078) FILED BY ATTORNEY ASTANEHE, MICHAEL
Date: September 25, 2020PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100100098) FILED BY DEFENDANT AIRBNB, INC
Date: March 19, 2020PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL (TRANSACTION ID # 65965078) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DOE, JANE
Date: September 25, 2020PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100101636) FILED BY DEFENDANT AIRBNB, INC
Date: April 23, 2020TRANSFER RECEIPT RECEIVED FROM SONOMA COUNTY W/NEW CASE NO.: SCV-268512.
Date: June 14, 2021ORDER GRANTING MOTION AND STIPULATION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO SONOMA COUNTY
Date: August 10, 2020PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 200011562) FILED BY DEFENDANT AIRBNB, INC
Date: June 10, 2020PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100104897) FILED BY DEFENDANT AIRBNB, INC
Date: June 23, 2020PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL (TRANSACTION ID # 66351320) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DOE, JANE ROE, JANE
Date: February 18, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event | TRANSFER RECEIPT RECEIVED FROM SONOMA COUNTY W/NEW CASE NO.: SCV-268512. | |
May 04, 2021 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF MAY-04-2021 IS OFF CALENDAR. CASE TRANSFERRED. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | TRANSFER ORDER; FEES PAID, TRANSFERRED TO SONOMA COUNTY VIA USPS CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT NO.: 7017 0660 0001 0721 5937. FILED PER ORDER BY DEFENDANT ANDERSON, STANLEY ANDERSON, CATHRYN | |
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event | CHANGE OF VENUE FEE FILED BY PLAINTIFF DOE, JANE ROE, JANE | |
March 02, 2021 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR MAR-02-2021 CONTINUED TO MAY-04-2021 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO COMPLETE TRANSFER. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 66351320) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DOE, JANE ROE, JANE JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS | |
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL (TRANSACTION ID # 66351320) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DOE, JANE ROE, JANE | |
January 20, 2021 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.