Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Ffg Restaurant Group, Inc., Forward Food Group, Llc, Ozyilmaz, Laura, Ozyilmaz, Sayat, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Doolittle, Wallace C., Schwartz, David Herman, against Does 1 To 100 Inclusive, Ozyilmaz, Laura, Ozyilmaz, Laura Gabriela, Ozyilmaz, Sayat, represented by Storm, Lucinda L, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Garrett L. Wong presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGarrett L. Wong Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 11, 2019 |
CategoryBusiness Tort |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
This complaint is filed by the law offices of Lucinda L. Storm on behalf of defendants and cross-complainants Laura Ozyilmaz and Sayat Ozyilmaz. The case number is CGC-19-581427 in the Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco. The compla...
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 12, 2020 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
|
July 24, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF AUG-12-2020 IS OFF CALENDAR. CASE CONSOLIDATED WITH CGC-19-580935. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
July 23, 2020 | Docket Event | ATTORNEYS AND PARTIES IN CONSOLIDATED ACTION CGC-19-581427 ADDED TO LEAD ACTION CGC-19-580935 FOR MAILING AND NOTICES. | |
July 22, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS OF CASE(S) CGC-19-581427 WITH CASE CGC-19-580935 FOR ALL PURPOSES; ALL FURTHER ENTRIES UNDER CASE CGC-19-580935 | |
July 10, 2020 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF SECOND AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 65760613) FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT OZYILMAZ, SAYAT OZYILMAZ, LAURA , INCORRECTLY SUED HEREIN AS "LAURA GABRIELA OZYILMAZ" | |
July 10, 2020 | Docket Event | 2ND AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 65760613) FILED PER ORDER BY CROSS COMPLAINANT OZYILMAZ, SAYAT OZYILMAZ, LAURA , INCORRECTLY SUED HEREIN AS "LAURA GABRIELA OZYILMAZ" AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT FFG RESTAURANT GROUP, INC. FORWARD FOOD GROUP, LLC LITZ, JOHN SOLLERS, YONGJIA ROES 1 THROUGH 30 | |
July 01, 2020 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
|
June 30, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER RE CROSS-DEFENDANTS FFG RESTAURANT GROUP, INC. AND FORWARDED FOOD GROUP, LLC DEMURRER TO FIRST MENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (SEE SCANNED ORDER FOR DETAILS) | |
June 30, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER ON DEMURRER TO AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT BY CROSS-DEFENDANTS JOHN LITZ AND YONGJIA SOLLERS (SEE SCANNED ORDER FOR DETAILS) | |
June 30, 2020 | Docket Event | MINUTES FOR JUN-30-2020 9:30 AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.