Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Cwi 2 San Francisco Hotel, L.P., filed a(n) Other Non Exempt Complaints case represented by Moll, Charles John, against City And County Of San Francisco, represented by Ruwart, Carole F., Wilensky, Julie, Yeh, Kevin, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Samuel K. Feng presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 26, 2019 |
CategoryOther Non Exempt Complaints |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
This complaint is filed by Charles J. Moll III and Marcy Jo Mandel, attorneys from the law firm McDermott Will & Emery LLP, on behalf of the plaintiff CWI 2 San Francisco Hotel, L.P. The complaint was filed in the Superior Court of California, County...
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 07, 2022 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
May 04, 2022 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAY-04-2022 CONTINUED TO SEP-07-2022 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
April 08, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 67464465) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CWI 2 SAN FRANCISCO HOTEL, L.P. ALSO FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 3.0 DAYS | |
April 08, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (TRANSACTION ID # 67464465) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO | |
January 05, 2022 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (TRANSACTION ID # 67200975) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO | |
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JAN-05-2022 CONTINUED TO MAY-04-2022 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 67160174) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CWI 2 SAN FRANCISCO HOTEL, L.P. ALSO FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 3.0 DAYS | |
September 01, 2021 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.