Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Buchanan, Erik, Mccann, Benjamin, filed a(n) General Securities - Securities case represented by Daryanani, Nicole Nacpil, Punzalan, Mark, against Does 1 Through 20, Inclusive, Friedensohn, Alyson, Modern Healthcare, Inc., A Delaware Corporation, Modern Life Inc., represented by Berger, David Joel, Good, Sarah Ann, Reicher, Janice, Stuart, Rebecca Lynn, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Ethan P. Schulman presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 25, 2019 |
CategorySecurities/Investment |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaSecurities |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Securities |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint was electronically filed in the Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco on March 6, 2020. The clerk of the court, Kalene Apolonio, processed the filing.
Unfortunately, the provided text does not contain any dollar amoun...
PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 65819939) FILED BY DEFENDANT FRIEDENSOHN, ALYSON
Date: August 03, 2020MINUTES FOR SEP-22-2020 9:30 AM
Date: September 22, 2020ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION
Date: September 11, 2020MINUTES FOR JUL-07-2020 9:30 AM
Date: July 07, 2020ORDER RELATING TO DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: July 07, 2020ORDER AND STIPULATION AND CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT. (SEE SCANNED ORDER FOR DETAILS)
Date: August 14, 2020NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: November 25, 2019ORDER GRANTING JOINDER BY DEFENDANT ALYSON FRIEDENSOHN
Date: September 23, 2020ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY
Date: August 04, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2021 | Hearing |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT , Or In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication
Judge: ETHAN P. SCHULMAN |
|
March 24, 2021 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION, 302, DEFENDANTS ALYSON FRIEDENSOHN, MODERN LIFE INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION, OFF CALENDAR PER REQUEST OF MOVING PARTY/CONSOLIDATION; EMAIL DATED 3/15/2021. (302) | |
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAR-24-2021 IS OFF CALENDAR. CASE CONSOLIDATED WITH CGC-19-580960. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 66376245) FILED BY DEFENDANT FRIEDENSOHN, ALYSON MODERN LIFE INC. D/B/A MODERN HEALTHCARE, INC. | |
February 25, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS OF CASE(S) CGC-19-581012 WITH CASE CGC-19-580960, ORDER; ALL FURTHER ENTRIES UNDER CASE CGC-19-580960 | |
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF NICOLE DARYANANI IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE (FILED UNDER CGC-19-580960) (TRANSACTION ID # 66328535) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MCCANN, BENJAMIN BUCHANAN, ERIK DERIVATIVELY ON BEHALF OF NOMINALDEFENDANT, MODERN HEALTHCARE, INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION | |
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 66328535) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MCCANN, BENJAMIN BUCHANAN, ERIK DERIVATIVELY ON BEHALF OF NOMINALDEFENDANT, MODERN HEALTHCARE, INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION | |
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE (FILED IN CGC-19-580960) (TRANSACTION ID # 66328535) (TRANSACTION ID # 66328535) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MCCANN, BENJAMIN BUCHANAN, ERIK DERIVATIVELY ON BEHALF OF NOMINALDEFENDANT, MODERN HEALTHCARE, INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION | |
February 08, 2021 | Hearing |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT , Or In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication
Judge: ETHAN P. SCHULMAN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.