Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
2801 Leavenworth-Cannery Llc, Wanigatunga,, Wanigatunga, Daruka, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Infelise, Robert D, against Does 1 To 20, Fort 1 Llc, Wanigatunga,, Wanigatunga, Daruka, represented by Mcann, Trevor, Pro Per, Winkler, Peter, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Samuel K. Feng presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 19, 2019 |
CategoryContract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This complaint document is a proof of service of summons in a legal case. It is filed in the Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco. The plaintiff/petitioner is 2801 Leavenworth-Cannery, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, and t...
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: January 07, 2021NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: November 19, 2019MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL FILED BY DEFENDANT WANIGATUNGA, DARUKA
Date: December 14, 2020SUMMONS ISSUED TO CROSS COMPLAINANT WANIGATUNGA, DARUKA
Date: June 16, 2020DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FILED BY DEFENDANT WANIGATUNGA, DARUKA
Date: December 16, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 23, 2022 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
July 12, 2022 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
July 08, 2022 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JUL-12-2022 CONTINUED TO AUG-23-2022 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR CROSS COMPLAINANT TO DISMISS CROSS COMPLAINT. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
July 07, 2022 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF ENTIRE ACTION (COMPLAINT ONLY) (TRANSACTION ID # 67799386) | |
May 24, 2022 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF MAY-24-2022 CONTINUED TO JUL-12-2022 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
May 24, 2022 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
May 24, 2022 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR MAY-24-2022 10:30 AM FOR DEPT 610 | |
March 29, 2022 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF MAR-29-2022 CONTINUED TO MAY-24-2022 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
January 25, 2022 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.