Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Robinson,, Robinson, Mariah P.O Box, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Pro Per, against Yeh, Lucas, represented by Ganapathy, Akhila, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Samuel K. Feng presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 11, 2019 |
CategoryPersonal Injury/Property Damage - Vehicle Related |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is a legal document notifying the defendant, Mariah Ranw, that they are being sued by the plaintiff, Mariah Ranw. The document states that the defendant has 30 calendar days to respond to the summons and legal papers served on them. It...
PROOF OF SERVICE OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROBINSON, MARIAH
Date: February 18, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE OF MEDICAL RECORDS FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROBINSON, MARIAH
Date: February 18, 2022OPPOSITION TO MTN TO DISMISS FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROBINSON, MARIAH
Date: February 17, 2022NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: October 11, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 23, 2022 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
May 24, 2022 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
May 06, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR MAY-24-2022 CONTINUED TO AUG-23-2022 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
March 22, 2022 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR MAR-22-2022 CONTINUED TO MAY-24-2022 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S ACTION FOR DELAY IN PROSECUTION | |
March 03, 2022 | Hearing |
Notice Of Motion And Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs Action For Delay In Prosecution
Judge: RICHARD B. ULMER |
|
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR MAR-03-2022 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302 | |
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION, 302, DEFENDANT LUCAS YEH'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS ACTION FOR DELAY IN PROSECUTION IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. CCP 583.410 AND 583.420 ARE DISCRETIONARY AND CALIFORNIA COURTS FAVOR RESOLUTION OF DISPUTES ON THEIR MERITS. ORDER IS SIGNED. JUDGE: RICHARD B. ULMER JR., CLERK: S. LE, COURT REPORTER: MARIA TORREANO, CSR#8600, MARIA.TORREANO@GMAIL.COM, REPORTED. =(302/RBU) | |
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROBINSON, MARIAH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.