Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Newton, Philip 6402 Irwin Court, Apt., filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Granahan, Conor, Pro Per, against Does 1 Through 20, Eat Club, Inc., represented by Hoffman, Michael, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Samuel K. Feng presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 11, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
This complaint is an answer filed by the defendant, Eat Club, Inc., in response to the plaintiff's unverified complaint for damages. Eat Club raises several affirmative defenses, including objections based on the plaintiff's breach of his duty to arb...
PROOF OF SERVICE - CIVIL (TRANSACTION ID # 64717655) FILED BY PLAINTIFF NEWTON, PHILIP
Date: February 13, 2020NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: October 11, 2019ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100091110) FILED BY DEFENDANT EAT CLUB, INC.
Date: December 10, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2021 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR COURT
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM MASTER COURT CALENDAR SET FOR FEB-08-2021 -- NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF; APPEARANCE BY MICHAEL B. MOORE, ESQ. FOR DEFENDANT EAT CLUB, INC. -- CASE IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR NON-APPEARANCE OF PLAINTIFF PHILIP NEWTON AT TRIAL CALL. . JUDGE: SAMUEL K. FENG; CLERK: JIROQUE; COURT REPORTER: MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206) | |
June 24, 2020 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
|
June 12, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100104201) FILED BY DEFENDANT EAT CLUB, INC. ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS | |
June 10, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, COURT TRIAL SET FOR FEB-08-2021 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON JUN-24-2020 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
May 20, 2020 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
|
May 06, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAY-20-2020 CONTINUED TO JUN-24-2020 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR THE SUBMISSION OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENTS. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
April 15, 2020 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
|
April 01, 2020 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL, (TRANSACTION ID # 65551912): PRO PER SUBSTITUTED FOR GRANAHAN, CONOR AS ATTORNEY FOR NEWTON, PHILIP | |
March 27, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF APR-15-2020 CONTINUED TO MAY-20-2020 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR PLAINTIFF COUNSEL TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.