Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Nan, Stephanie, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Simes, Laurel Lisa, against Does 1 To 50 Inclusive, Lyft, Inc., Lyft, Inc., A Delaware Corporation, represented by Metlitzky, Warren, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Garrett L. Wong presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 23, 2019 |
CategoryPersonal Injury/Property Damage - Non-Vehicle Related |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
This complaint was electronically filed in the Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco on September 6, 2019. The document appears to be a complaint in a legal case.
Unfortunately, the provided text does not contain any specific dollar...
JOINT STIPULATION VACATING CASE MGMT CONFERENCE
Date: November 10, 2020PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 64627000) FILED BY PLAINTIFF NAN, STEPHANIE AN INDIVIDUAL
Date: January 15, 2020PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 64529979) FILED BY PLAINTIFF NAN, STEPHANIE AN INDIVIDUAL
Date: December 16, 2019PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100084317) FILED BY DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.
Date: September 25, 2019NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: August 23, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 20, 2021 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
|
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JAN-20-2021 IS OFF CALENDAR. CASE COORDINATED WITH JCCP 5061. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDERS RE ORDER ASSIGNING COORDINATION TRIAL JUDGE AND ORDER FOR REASSIGNMENT AFTER 170.6 PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE (TRANSACTION ID # 66228303) FILED BY PLAINTIFF NAN, STEPHANIE AN INDIVIDUAL | |
November 25, 2020 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
|
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF NOV-25-2020 CONTINUED TO JAN-20-2021 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS OF COORDINATION. *** NOTE: PLEASE COMPLY WITH CRC 3.529 IF A COORDINATION ORDER HAS BEEN FILED. *** NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
November 10, 2020 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION VACATING CASE MGMT CONFERENCE | |
November 09, 2020 | Docket Event | FEE PAID ON JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (TRANSACTION ID # 100116057) FILED BY DEFENDANT LYFT, INC. | |
July 22, 2020 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
|
July 08, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-22-2020 CONTINUED TO NOV-25-2020 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS OF COORDINATION. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
July 07, 2020 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (TRANSACTION ID # 100105891) FILED BY DEFENDANT LYFT, INC. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.