Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Added Dimensions, Inc., Berkeley Roof Services Inc., Cell-Crete Corporation, Curtis Edward Dennison Landscape, Inc., First, Last & Always, Inc., (total of 10) See All filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Aguilera, Abel Eric, Bartlett, Deborah L., Blackwell, Patricia A., Buehler, Mark B, Dougherty, Colleen B., (total of 21) See All against Acme Home Elevator, Inc., A California Corporation, Added Dimensions, Inc., Barcewski Inc. Dba Sunshine Construction, Barewski Inc., Berkeley Roof Services, Inc., A California, (total of 21) See All represented by Constantino, Matthew S., Home, Walter S, Potocki, Joseph P., in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with GARRETT L. WONG presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 31, 2019 |
CategoryContract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a cross-complaint filed by First, Last & Always, Inc. in the Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco. The case number is CGC-19-578072. The cross-complaint is against various defendants, including Matarozzi/Pelsinger B...
SUMMONS ISSUED TO CROSS COMPLAINANT RADONICH ENTERPRISES, INC. DBA WILDCAT METALS
Date: March 03, 2020SUMMONS ISSUED TO CROSS COMPLAINANT MATAROZZI/PELSINGER BUILDERS, INC.
Date: December 27, 2019ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT (TRANSACTION #66826511)
Date: August 05, 2021ORDER AFTER INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (TRANSACTION 66718705)
Date: June 25, 2021MINUTES FOR JUN-24-2021 9:15 AM
Date: June 24, 2021NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 67230186) FILED BY ATTORNEY RODMAN, JORDAN A.
Date: January 12, 2022ORDER GENERAL ORDER RE CASE REASSIGNMENT
Date: December 30, 2021ORDER AFTER NOVEMBER 29, 2021 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (TRANSACTION 67128213)
Date: November 29, 2021MINUTES FOR NOV-29-2021 11:00 AM
Date: November 29, 2021DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 67173452) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT CHRIS FRENCH METAL, INC.
Date: December 16, 2021MINUTES FOR SEP-30-2021 9:15 AM
Date: September 30, 2021ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO INTERVENE BY THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT
Date: April 21, 2021DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 200020381) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT ADDED DIMENSIONS, INC.
Date: November 25, 2020NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 66082009) FILED BY ATTORNEY NGUYEN, CANDICE H
Date: November 04, 2020ORDER TO ALLOW FILING OF MOE AMENDMENT
Date: September 08, 2020NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: July 31, 2019ORDER - CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 4 (TRANSACTION 70726581)
Date: August 25, 2023MINUTES FOR JUN-21-2023 1:30 PM
Date: June 21, 2023ORDER CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 3 [TRANSACTION NO. 69913709]
Date: April 27, 2023ORDER AFTER NOVEMBER 21, 2022 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (TRANSACTION 68416721)
Date: November 21, 2022ORDER - INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (REFEREE) (TRANSACTION #66953001)
Date: September 21, 2021ORDER AFTER MAY 31, 2022 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (TRANSACTION 67676741)
Date: May 31, 2022ORDER INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (TRANSACTION #66953001)
Date: September 21, 2021MINUTES FOR SEP-21-2021 10:00 AM
Date: September 21, 2021ORDER SEPTEMBER 21, 2021, CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER (TRANSACTION #66953001)
Date: September 21, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 26, 2024 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO |
|
October 16, 2023 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO |
|
September 29, 2023 | Hearing |
PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE
Judge: ETHAN P. SCHULMAN |
|
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER - CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 4 (TRANSACTION 70726581) | |
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event | AMENDMENT TO CROSS COMPLAINT PER ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 70706133) CROSS DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS FOE 1 TO BE MAROC PAINTING, INC. | |
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER TO ALLOW FILING OF QUANTUM WINDOWS AND DOORS, INC'S FIRST FOE AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION 70695920) | |
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER - PROTECTIVE ORDER (TRANSACTION 70695250) | |
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event | FEE PAID ON: PROTECTIVE ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 70670654) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SATOOSH, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY | |
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event | **FEE PAID FOR** [PROPOSED] ORDER TO ALLOW FILING OF QUANTUM WINDOWS AND DOORS, INC.S FIRST FOE AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 70675081) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT QUANTUM WINDOWS AND DOORS, INC. A DISSOLVED WASHINGTON CORPORATION | |
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND HANDLING ATTORNEY (TRANSACTION ID # 70544334) FILED BY ATTORNEY MCCORMICK, JAMES L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.