Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Pogosian, Jack H., against Bondoc, Reginald, Does 1 To 10, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Garrett L. Wong presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMarch 01, 2019 |
CategoryExempt Collections (Rule 3.740) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions438 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
This complaint is a proof of service of summons document in a legal case. The plaintiff, Midland Funding LLC, is serving the defendant, Reginald Bondoc, with various documents including the summons, complaint, civil case cover sheet, alternative disp...
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 21, 2020 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
|
June 30, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JUL-21-2020 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
May 12, 2020 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 65633015) | |
April 21, 2020 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
|
April 07, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR APR-21-2020 CONTINUED TO JUL-21-2020 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
March 06, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR APR-21-2020 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
September 03, 2019 | Docket Event | CRC 3.740 REVIEW | |
April 05, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100043872), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC SERVED MAR-06-2019, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT BONDOC, REGINALD | |
March 01, 2019 | Docket Event | EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC AS TO DEFENDANT BONDOC, REGINALD DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON AUG-28-2019 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.