Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Arcadia Partner Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Vos, Ryan E., against Does 1 To 10, Inclusive, Granillo, Stephanie, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Garrett L. Wong presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2019 |
CategoryExempt Collections (Rule 3.740) |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time354 days |
This complaint is a Case Management Order issued by the Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco. The case number is CGC-19-572893 and it involves Arcadia Partner LLC as the plaintiff and Stephanie Granillo et al as the defendant(s). The...
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 200013402) | |
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event | SANCTION PAYMENT DEPOSITED BY PLAINTIFF ARCADIA PARTNER LLC | |
October 29, 2019 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED AS TO ENTIRE ACTION BY COURT AT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING OCT-29-2019 AT 10:30 AM. THE COURT FINDS THAT A LESS SEVERE SANCTION WOULD NOT BE EFFECTIVE IN LIGHT OF THE HISTORY OF FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THE COURT'S ORDERS AND RULES. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
October 29, 2019 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
|
October 29, 2019 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR OCT-29-2019 10:30 AM FOR DEPT 610 | |
September 11, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR SEP-10-2019 CONTINUED TO OCT-29-2019 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT. ***NOTICE: IMPENDING DISCRETIONARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE 68608(B).*** NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
September 11, 2019 | Docket Event | SANCTIONS ORDERED IN THE AMOUNT OF $400.00 AGAINST RYAN E. VOS, ESQ. FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON: SEP-10-2019, PAYABLE ON OR BEFORE OCT-01-2019. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
September 11, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR SEP-10-2019 CONTINUED TO OCT-29-2019 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT. ***NOTICE: IMPENDING DISCRETIONARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE §68608(B).*** NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
September 10, 2019 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
|
September 10, 2019 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR SEP-10-2019 10:30 AM FOR DEPT 610 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.