Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Vinocur, Laurence, filed a(n) Other Non Exempt Complaints (/ Complaint For Civil Penalties And Injuntive Relief) case represented by Chanler, Clifford A, Paras, Laralei S., against Argento Sc By Sicura Inc., Does 1-150, Inclusive, The Tjx Companyies, Inc., represented by Margulies, Jeffrey B, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Garrett L. Wong presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGarrett L. Wong Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2019 |
CategoryOther Non Exempt Complaints (/ Complaint For Civil Penalties And Injuntive Relief) |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions162 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time190 days |
ORDER APPROVING PROPOSITION 65 SETTLEMENT AND CONSENT JUDGMENT
Date: June 10, 2019NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: January 03, 2019NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100046938)
Date: June 14, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 24, 2019 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
|
July 12, 2019 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100048039) FILED BY PLAINTIFF VINOCUR, LAURENCE | |
July 10, 2019 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-24-2019 IS OFF CALENDAR. JUDGMENT/DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
June 28, 2019 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100076252) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE TJX COMPANYIES, INC. ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS | |
June 27, 2019 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100047438) FILED BY PLAINTIFF VINOCUR, LAURENCE | |
June 14, 2019 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100046940) AS TO DEFENDANT THE TJX COMPANYIES, INC. DOES 1-150, INCLUSIVE | |
June 14, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100046938) | |
June 14, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 100046938) FILED BY PLAINTIFF VINOCUR, LAURENCE | |
June 14, 2019 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER AND NOTICE ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100046938) FILED BY PLAINTIFF VINOCUR, LAURENCE | |
June 10, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING PROPOSITION 65 SETTLEMENT AND CONSENT JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.