Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Rusanovschi, Nina, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Lamchick, Gail Judith, Walker, Walter Herbert, against Does 1 To 100, Nakashima, Yoshio, represented by Allard, Nancy Sandoval, Gray, Wilma J, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with John Kennedy Stewart presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2019 |
CategoryPersonal Injury/Property Damage - Vehicle Related |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Cycle Time421 days |
ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION BY DEFENDANT
Date: April 20, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 64814683)
Date: March 10, 2020MOTION IN LIMINE SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT. FILED BY DEFENDANT NAKASHIMA, YOSHIO
Date: February 13, 2020TRIAL BRIEF (TRANSACTION ID # 64754920) FILED BY PLAINTIFF RUSANOVSCHI, NINA
Date: February 24, 202012 MOTIONS IN LIMINE SEE SCANNED DOCUMENTS FILED BY DEFENDANT NAKASHIMA, YOSHIO
Date: February 10, 2020TRIAL BRIEF SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT. FILED BY DEFENDANT NAKASHIMA, YOSHIO
Date: February 10, 2020ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100061222) FILED BY DEFENDANT NAKASHIMA, YOSHIO
Date: January 31, 2019ORDER AFTER HEARING
Date: June 12, 2020MINUTES FOR JUN-05-2020 9:30 AM
Date: June 05, 2020EXHIBIT/DEPOSITION RECEIPT SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT
Date: February 26, 2020MINUTES FOR FEB-25-2020 9:30 AM
Date: February 25, 2020MINUTES FOR FEB-19-2020 9:30 AM
Date: February 19, 2020MINUTES FOR FEB-24-2020 9:30 AM
Date: February 24, 2020MINUTES FOR FEB-20-2020 9:30 AM
Date: February 20, 2020MINUTES FOR FEB-21-2020 10:30 AM
Date: February 21, 2020MINUTES FOR FEB-18-2020 9:30 AM
Date: February 18, 2020MINUTES FOR FEB-13-2020 9:30 AM
Date: February 13, 2020JURY NOTES
Date: March 02, 2020MINUTES FOR FEB-26-2020 9:30 AM
Date: February 27, 2020EXHIBIT LIST FOR DEFENDANTS FILED
Date: March 02, 2020JURY VERDICT SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT.
Date: February 27, 2020EXHIBIT/DEPOSITION RECEIPT SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT.
Date: February 27, 2020MINUTES FOR FEB-27-2020 9:30 AM
Date: February 27, 2020MINUTES FOR FEB-11-2020 9:30 AM
Date: February 11, 2020MINUTES FOR FEB-10-2020 1:30 PM
Date: February 10, 2020EXHIBIT LIST SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT. FILED BY PLAINTIFF RUSANOVSCHI, NINA
Date: February 10, 2020NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: January 02, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT, FULLY SATISFIED, (TRANSACTION ID # 200018252) FILED BY PLAINTIFF RUSANOVSCHI, NINA AS TO DEFENDANT NAKASHIMA, YOSHIO | |
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT, FULLY SATISFIED, (TRANSACTION ID # 200017574) FILED BY PLAINTIFF RUSANOVSCHI, NINA AS TO DEFENDANT NAKASHIMA, YOSHIO | |
July 06, 2020 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING AMENDED JUDGMENT ON VERDICT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF RUSANOVSCHI, NINA RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT NAKASHIMA, YOSHIO DOES 1 TO 100 $963,264.59 PRINCIPAL, $35,420.78 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $998,685.37, JUDGMENT IS SUBJECT TO INTEREST AT THE RATE OF 10% PER ANNUM, OR $273.61 PER DAY, COMMENCING WITH THE ORIGINAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON MARCH 2, 2020, AND CONTINUING UNTIL THE AMNOUNT IS PAID IN FULL. SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS. | |
June 25, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED DENYING TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 200012205) FILED BY DEFENDANT NAKASHIMA, YOSHIO | |
June 19, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL OR ADDITUR BASED ON FAILURE TO COMPENSATE FOR PAIN AND SUFFERING | |
June 12, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER AFTER HEARING | |
June 05, 2020 | Docket Event | MINUTES FOR JUN-05-2020 9:30 AM | |
June 05, 2020 | Hearing |
MOTION - Plaintiff'S Motion For New Trial Or Additur Based On Failure To Compensate For Pain And Suffering
Judge: JOHN K. STEWART |
|
June 05, 2020 | Docket Event | TRIAL MOTION CALENDAR ON JUN-05-2020 IN 504, MOTION - PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL OR ADDITUR BASED ON FAILURE TO COMPENSATE FOR PAIN AND SUFFERING IS DENIED. COUNSEL TO SUBMIT PROPOSED ORDERS FOR THEIR RESPECTIVE MOTIONS TO THE COURT FOR REVIEW AND SIGNATURE. PROCEEDINGS REPORTED BY ERIN ROBERTSON CSR# 15299 T: 925.658.7786; JUDGE: JOHN K. STEWART; CLERK: JOHNNY SENGMANY (D504). | |
May 29, 2020 | Docket Event | REPLY TO DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO TAX DEFENDANTS MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (TRANSACTION ID # 65666696) FILED BY PLAINTIFF RUSANOVSCHI, NINA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.