Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Blake, Victoria, French, Susan, Mcclary, Steven, Niskanen, Valeri, Ortegon, Tamlyn, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Brayton, Alan Richard, against 3M Company, A.J. Peters & Son, Aladdin Heating Corporation, Anderson, Rowe & Buckley, Inc., Asbestos Corporation Limited, (total of 48) See All represented by Bailey, Bobbie R., Barber, Steven J., Bergstrom, Emily D, Bernard, Randall K, Boone, Mordecai D., (total of 36) See All in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Cynthia Ming-mei Lee presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCynthia Ming-mei Lee Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 11, 2019 |
CategoryAsbestos |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions93 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 67024342) FILED BY ATTORNEY PRINDLE, KENNETH B
Date: October 19, 2021DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 66368487) FILED BY DEFENDANT GOULDS PUMPS LLC
Date: February 24, 2021ANSWER TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 66368487) FILED BY DEFENDANT GOULDS PUMPS LLC
Date: February 24, 2021ANSWER TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 66207302) FILED BY DEFENDANT PFIZER, INC.
Date: December 22, 2020ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: October 22, 2020DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 66007684) FILED BY DEFENDANT GRINNELL LLC
Date: October 09, 2020ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 66007584) FILED BY DEFENDANT GRINNELL LLC
Date: October 09, 2020ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 65905857) FILED BY DEFENDANT 3M COMPANY
Date: September 04, 2020ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY DEFENDANT ROBERTSHAW CONTROLS COMPANY
Date: February 07, 2020DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 64676003) FILED BY DEFENDANT COSCO FIRE PROTECTION, INC.
Date: January 30, 2020ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT 3M COMPANY
Date: February 05, 2020NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: December 11, 2019DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 64677730) FILED BY DEFENDANT JOHNSON CONTROLS, INC.
Date: January 31, 2020ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT FRANK BONETTI PLUMBING, INC.
Date: February 07, 2020ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 64682215) FILED BY DEFENDANT CONTRA COSTA ELECTRIC, INC.
Date: February 05, 2020ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 64682403) FILED BY DEFENDANT FLUOR CORPORATION
Date: February 05, 2020ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 64677730) FILED BY DEFENDANT JOHNSON CONTROLS, INC.
Date: January 31, 2020DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 67732324)
Date: June 16, 2022DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 67329987) AS TO DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION LLC
Date: February 18, 2022ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 64595556) FILED BY DEFENDANT FDCC CALIFORNIA, INC.
Date: January 08, 2020ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT ANDERSON, ROWE & BUCKLEY, INC.
Date: February 07, 2020ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 64700577) FILED BY DEFENDANT D. ZELINSKY & SONS, INC.
Date: February 10, 2020ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 64725150) FILED BY DEFENDANT OSCAR E. ERICKSON, INC.
Date: February 13, 2020ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 64735859) FILED BY DEFENDANT SCOTT CO. OF CALIFORNIA
Date: February 18, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 70762459) EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN COSTS. AS TO DEFENDANT O C MCDONALD CO INC | |
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 70555430) EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN COSTS. AS TO DEFENDANT DOUGLASS INSULATION COMPANY, INC. | |
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 70555264) EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN COSTS. AS TO DEFENDANT CONTRA COSTA ELECTRIC, INC. | |
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 70064332) EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN COSTS. AS TO DEFENDANT ALADDIN HEATING CORPORATION | |
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ONLY. EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN COSTS. (TRANSACTION ID # 69991813) AS TO DEFENDANT IMO INDUSTRIES INC. | |
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 69984346) PLAINTIFFS HEREBY DISMISS ALL ALLEGATIONS, IF ANY, RELATED TO EXPOSURE TO ASSBESTOS ON OR AFTER DECEMBER 5, 1980 AS TO ASBESTOS CORPORATION LIMITED ONLY AND AMENDS THEIR COMPLAINT(S) ACCORDINGLY. | |
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL (TRANSACTION ID # 69816645) FILED BY PLAINTIFF NISKANEN, VALERI , AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF BILLY JOE MCCLARY, DECEASED BLAKE, VICTORIA ORTEGON, TAMLYN FRENCH, SUSAN , AS WRONFUL DEATH HEIRS OF BILLY JOE MCCLARY, DECEASED MCCLARY, STEVEN , AS WRONFUL DEATH HEIRS OF BILLY JOE MCCLARY, DECEASED | |
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ONLY - EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN COSTS. (TRANSACTION ID # 69800527) AS TO DEFENDANT ROBERTSHAW CONTROLS COMPANY | |
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT ONLY AND AMENDS THEIR COMPLAINT ACCORDINGLY.(TRANSACTION ID # 69746249) (TRANSACTION ID # 69746249) AS TO DEFENDANT DOUGLASS INSULATION COMPANY, INC. | |
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 69691505) PLAINTIFF HEREBY DISMISSES ALL ALLEGATIONS, IF ANY, RELATED TO EXPOSURS TO ASBESTOS ON OR AFTER DECEMBER 5, 1980 AS TO IMO INDUSTRIES INC. ONLY AND AMENDS HIS COMPLAINT(S) ACCORDINGLY. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.