Case Last Refreshed: 8 hours ago
Sullivan, Elizabeth, Sullivan, Larry, Sullivan, Troy, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Brayton, Alan Richard, Pro Per, Williams, Nancy T, against Anheuser-Busch, Llc, Antioch Auto Supply, Asbestos Corporation Limited, Borgwarner Morse Tec Llc, Caterpillar, Inc., (total of 31) See All represented by Bailey, Bobbie R., Barber, Steven J., Bergstrom, Emily D, Bernhardt, Dirk, Cormier, Jennifer A., (total of 22) See All in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Rochelle C. East presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management90 days |
|
Filing DateMarch 12, 2019 |
CategoryAsbestos |
|
Last RefreshedMay 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions14 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a complaint-in-intervention filed by Great American Insurance Company ("Great American") in the Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco. The case number is CGC-19-276767. The plaintiffs in the original action are Troy ...
ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PREFERENCE AND EXTENDING DISCOVERY CUT-OFF
Date: May 30, 2019ORDER SUBSTITUTING SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST FOR DECEASED PLAINTIFF
Date: October 10, 2019ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL
Date: March 17, 2022NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: March 12, 2019ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PREFERENCE AND EXTENDING DISCOVERY CUT-OFF
Date: September 08, 2022ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 68352386) FILED BY DEFENDANT SUN SHIP, LLC
Date: November 04, 2022DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT GOULDS PUMPS LLC ONLY (TRANSACTION ID # 69127529)
Date: February 10, 2023ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 63198201) FILED BY DEFENDANT TRIMON, INC.
Date: April 24, 2019ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 63205453) FILED BY DEFENDANT CATERPILLAR, INC.
Date: April 26, 2019NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 66077518) FILED BY ATTORNEY BAILEY, BOBBIE R.
Date: November 03, 2020ORDER TO APPORTION AND DISTRIBUTE FUNDS
Date: April 21, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 05, 2024 | Hearing |
ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ROCHELLE EAST |
|
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON APR-04-2024 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON SEP-05-2024 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 301 PER REQUEST OF COUNSEL TO ALLOW TIME TO FILE A PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF COMPROMISE. KIMBERLY CHU, ESQ., OF BRAYTON PURCELL APPEARING FOR PLAINTIFF VIA COURTCALL. JUDGE: ROCHELLE C. EAST. CLERK: J. ALAMEDA. NOT REPORTED. (301) | |
April 04, 2024 | Hearing |
ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ROCHELLE EAST |
|
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event | CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAR-07-2024 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON APR-04-2024 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 301 PER REQUEST OF COUNSEL. KIMBERLY CHU, ESQ., OF BRAYTON PURCELL APPEARING FOR PLAINTIFF VIA COURTCALL. JUDGE: ROCHELLE C. EAST, CLERK: J. ALAMEDA. NOT REPORTED. (301) | |
March 07, 2024 | Hearing |
ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: ROCHELLE EAST |
|
February 08, 2024 | Docket Event | CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAR-07-2024 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAR-07-2024 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 301 ON COURT'S OWN MOTION AFTER ASBESTOS DEPARTMENTAL REASSIGNMENT FROM JUDGE SAMUEL FENG IN DEPT 503 TO JUDGE ROCHELLE EAST IN DEPT. 301. (301) | |
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event | CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON AUG-03-2023 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAR-07-2024 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF COUNSEL. KIMBERLY CHU, ESQ., APPEARING FOR PLAINTIFF VIA COURTCALL. JUDGE: SAMUEL K. FENG, CLERK: D. AU. NOT REPORTED. (503) | |
August 03, 2023 | Hearing |
ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
May 15, 2023 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY ASBESTOS
Judge: CYNTHIA M. LEE |
|
May 11, 2023 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ONLY. EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN COSTS. (TRANSACTION ID # 69995229) AS TO DEFENDANT IMO INDUSTRIES, INC. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.