Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Jonathan Neil & Associates, Inc., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Hatkoff, Bruce A, against Does 1 To 50, Inclusive, Haller, Joseph P., Hannula, Ian M., Nico Corporation, represented by Fernandez Iii, Reno F.R., in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Garrett L. Wong presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 28, 2018 |
CategoryCommon Counts/Open Book Account/Collections |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time420 days |
This complaint is a proof of service document filed in the Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco. The plaintiff in the case is Jonathan Neil & Associates, Inc., and the defendant is Nico Corporation. The document provides details of t...
GENERAL DENIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 64092441) FILED BY DEFENDANT HANNULA, IAN M.
Date: August 13, 2019ORDER ON STIPULATION SETTING ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT
Date: July 24, 2019GENERAL DENIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 64092441) FILED BY DEFENDANT NICO CORPORATION
Date: August 13, 2019NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: November 28, 2018GENERAL DENIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 64092441) FILED BY DEFENDANT HALLER, JOSEPH P.
Date: August 13, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 01, 2027 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
|
January 27, 2020 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR SHORT CAUSE
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
|
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM MASTER SHORT CAUSE CALENDAR SET FOR JAN-27-2020 - CASE SETTLED PER NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED ON 12/30/19. ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 610 ON JUN-01-2027 AT 10:30 AM FOR DISMISSAL PER CRC 3.1385. (206) | |
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 64647471) FILED BY PLAINTIFF JONATHAN NEIL & ASSOCIATES, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ALSO FILED BY DEFENDANT NICO CORPORATION HANNULA, IAN M. HALLER, JOSEPH P. | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100092650) FILED BY PLAINTIFF JONATHAN NEIL & ASSOCIATES, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ALSO FILED BY DEFENDANT NICO CORPORATION HANNULA, IAN M. HALLER, JOSEPH P. | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT) (TRANSACTION ID # 100092650) FILED BY PLAINTIFF JONATHAN NEIL & ASSOCIATES, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID FOR ORDER (FOR COURT TO DISMISS CASE AND RETAIN JURISDICTION PENDING COMPLETION OF STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT) (TRANSACTION ID # 100092650) FILED BY PLAINTIFF JONATHAN NEIL & ASSOCIATES, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION | |
September 25, 2019 | Hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
|
September 12, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, SHORT CAUSE TRIAL SET FOR JAN-27-2020 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON SEP-25-2019 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
September 10, 2019 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (JOINTLY) (TRANSACTION ID # 64187241) FILED BY DEFENDANT NICO CORPORATION HANNULA, IAN M. HALLER, JOSEPH P. JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 1.0 DAYS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.